Jay Blahnik Inc. v. WaterRower Inc.
Plaintiff: JAY BLAHNIK INC.
Defendant: WaterRower Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00026
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 WaterRower's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jay Blahnik Inc. by WaterRower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Connor, Christopher)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Elizabeth M. Nagle to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1595705 ) filed by Jay Blahnik Inc.. (Scott, Craig)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth M. Nagle filed by Craig M. Scott. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/19/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. WaterRower Inc. answer due 3/8/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/18/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Alison C. Casey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1594182 ) filed by WaterRower Inc.. (O'Connor, Christopher)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Patrick J. Concannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1594179 ) filed by WaterRower Inc.. (O'Connor, Christopher)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Heather B. Repicky to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1594143 ) filed by WaterRower Inc.. (O'Connor, Christopher)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Heather Repicky ; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick J. Concannon; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alison C. Casey filed by Christopher J. O'Connor. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/16/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
February 15, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by WaterRower Inc.. Responses due by 3/1/2021. (O'Connor, Christopher)
February 15, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WaterRower Inc.. (O'Connor, Christopher)
February 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. O'Connor on behalf of All Defendants (O'Connor, Christopher)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Blahnik Inc.. WaterRower Inc. served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Scott, Craig)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jay Blahnik Inc.. (Scott, Craig)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (Potter, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2021: #1 Com/Exhibits) (Potter, Carrie).
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WaterRower Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1584696 ), filed by JAY BLAHNIK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons)(Scott, Craig) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/15/2021) (Potter, Carrie).
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1584696 ), filed by JAY BLAHNIK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons)(Scott, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jay Blahnik Inc. v. WaterRower Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WaterRower Inc.
Represented By: Heather Repicky
Represented By: Patrick J. Concannon
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY BLAHNIK INC.
Represented By: Craig M. Scott
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?