Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC v. Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sparkman & Stephens, LLC and Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00029
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Francis J. Duffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1601721 ) filed by Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc.. (Parks, Joshua)
March 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Sapna W. Palla to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1601696 ) filed by Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc.. (Parks, Joshua)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sapna W. Palla ; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Francis J. Duffin. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/11/2021. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #13 Stipulation filed by Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc. Answer or responsive pleading due 3/25/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/11/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc.. (Parks, Joshua)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Parks on behalf of Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc. (Parks, Joshua)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC in support of #1 Complaint, Amended Exh B. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exh E, #2 Exhibit Amended Exh G)(McNally, Christopher)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC. Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (McNally, Christopher)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sparkman & Stephens, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC for Sparkman & Stephens, LLC.. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sparkman & Stephens, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC for Sparkman & Stephens, LLC.. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 AO FORM 121: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 AO FORM 121: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Sparkman & Stephens, LLC for Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC.. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Sparkman & Stephens, LLC for Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC.. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Eric W. Schweibenz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1584953 ) filed by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Eric W. Schweibenz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1584953 ) filed by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Stephen P. McBride to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1584945 ) filed by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Stephen P. McBride to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1584945 ) filed by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC. (McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1584936 ), filed by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gesture Construction & Arrangement.pdf, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1584936 ), filed by Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC, Sparkman & Stephens, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gesture Construction & Arrangement.pdf, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNally, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stphen P. McBride; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric W.e Schweibenz. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/15/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stphen P. McBride; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric W.e Schweibenz. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/15/2021. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC v. Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparkman & Stephens, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. McBride
Represented By: Peter Brent Regan
Represented By: Eric W. Schweibenz
Represented By: Christopher J. McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparkman & Stephens Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. McBride
Represented By: Peter Brent Regan
Represented By: Eric W. Schweibenz
Represented By: Christopher J. McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mystic Seaport Museum, Inc.
Represented By: Sapna W. Palla
Represented By: Francis J. Duffin
Represented By: Joshua S. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?