Faye v. Quicken Loans
Plaintiff: Moustapha Faye
Defendant: Quicken Loans, LLC formerly known as Quicken Loans, Inc. doing business as Quicken Loans Mortgage Services doing business as QLMS doing business as Rocket Mortgage doing business as Life Rock doing business as Rocket Life doing business as Rocket HQ and Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00035
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moustapha Faye. Quicken Loans, LLC served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Hicks, Alyson) Modified security due to personal identifiers on 3/8/2021 (Hicks, Alyson).
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Quicken Loans, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Moustapha Faye. (Potter, Carrie)
January 21, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 14670024666 (Hicks, Alyson)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $402.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 2/9/2021. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/19/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Moustapha Faye. (Potter, Carrie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by Moustapha Faye. (Potter, Carrie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Moustapha Faye. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faye v. Quicken Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, LLC formerly known as Quicken Loans, Inc. doing business as Quicken Loans Mortgage Services doing business as QLMS doing business as Rocket Mortgage doing business as Life Rock doing business as Rocket Life doing business as Rocket HQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moustapha Faye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?