Paradise v. Brown University
Plaintiff: Lauren Paradise
Defendant: Brown University
Case Number: 1:2021cv00057
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #10 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brown University - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/3/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Dismissal of the Litigation with Prejudice) filed by Brown University. (Richard, Steven)
February 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2021 with Attorneys Steven Richard and Richard Ratcliffe. (Telephhone Conference at 9:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Extending Defendant's Response Date to March 8, 2021) filed by Brown University. (Richard, Steven)
February 25, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with counsel for record. Dial-in instructions emailed to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
February 25, 2021 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference rescheduled for 2/26/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with counsel of record. Dial-in instructions remain the same as previously emailed.(Saucier, Martha)
February 22, 2021 NOTICE of Remote Hearing: Chambers Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 9:30 AM via Zoom before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. The Court will send Zoom access information to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 22, 2021 HEARING CANCELLED: Motion Hearing scheduled for 2/24/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Mary S. McElroy is hereby CANCELLED. (Urizandi, Nisshy) Modified on 2/22/2021 (Urizandi, Nisshy).
February 16, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with all counsel of record. (Saucier, Martha)
February 16, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 2/16/2021 with Attorneys Richard Ratcliffe, Steven Richard and Michael Grabo. (Telephone Conference at 9:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 14, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 2/14/2021 with Plaintiff's counsel. (Telephone Conference)(Saucier, Martha)
February 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 2/12/2021 with Attorneys Michael Grabo and Steven Richard. ( Telephone Conference at 3:25.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 2/12/2021 with Attorney Richard Ratcliffe. (Telephone Conference at 10:18.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 11, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 2/11/2021 with Attorney Richard Ratcliffe. (Telephone Conference at 4:50.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 11, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 2/11/2021 with Attorneys Steven Richard and Michael Grabo. (Telephone Conference at 4:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 11, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with defense counsel only. Dial-in instructions to be emailed to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
February 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 2/10/2021. (Courtroom Video Conference at 2:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 9, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 2/9/2021 with Attorneys Richard Ratcliffe, Steven Richard and Michael Grabo. ( Telephone Conference at 3:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 9, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 047 9881, Passcode: 183642) (Saucier, Martha)
February 8, 2021 RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference with Counsel to discuss scheduling a settlement conference RESCHEDULED for 2/9/2021 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Same call in information applies. (Noel, Jeannine)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief (ECF No. #4 ) - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/5/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Paradise. Brown University served on 2/2/2021, answer due 2/23/2021. (Ratcliffe, J.)
February 4, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with counsel of record to discuss scheduling of settlement conference. Dial-in instructions emailed to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Grabo on behalf of Brown University (Grabo, Michael)
February 3, 2021 NOTICE of Remote Hearing: Chambers Conference set for 2/3/2021 at 3:00 PM via Zoom before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. The Court will send Zoom access information to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 3, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: Chambers Conference held on 2/3/2021. Richard Ratcliffe, Steven Richard, and Michael Grabo participated. (Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky via Zoom at 3:20 p.m.) (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: All briefs re Preliminary Injunction and #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order due on or before 2/19/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/3/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 3, 2021 NOTICE of Remote Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing and #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 9:30 AM via Zoom before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Zoom Meeting ID: 160 761 5080, Passcode: 175061) (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 3, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Settlement Conference. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of Brown University (Richard, Steven)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of Brown University (Richard, Steven)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lauren Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Ratcliffe, J.)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lauren Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Ratcliffe, J.)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brown University. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brown University. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1590038 ), filed by Lauren Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ratcliffe, J.)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1590038 ), filed by Lauren Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ratcliffe, J.)
February 2, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 2, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paradise v. Brown University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Paradise
Represented By: J. Richard Ratcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Represented By: Michael D. Grabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?