Traghella et al v. North Kingstown School Department et al
Plaintiff: Jodi Traghella and Mark Traghella
Defendant: North Kingstown School Department, Angelica Infante-Green, Ocean State Transit, LLC., First Student, Inc. and Council on Elementry and Secondary Education
Case Number: 1:2021cv00082
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with counsel of record. Dial-in instructions emailed to counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
April 13, 2021 HEARING CANCELLED re #14 Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan has been cancelled. (Saucier, Martha)
April 12, 2021 DISREGARD THIS ENTRY/MADE IN ERROR CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 4/13/2021: referral made in wrong matter, please disregard (Jackson, Ryan).
March 30, 2021 Filing 13 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/13/2021. (Fanning, Stephen)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; Responses due by 4/19/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/30/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; Responses due by 4/2/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/8/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda R. Prosek on behalf of Ocean State Transit, LLC. (Prosek, Amanda)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/16/2021. (Fanning, Stephen)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Council on Elementry and Secondary Education, Angelica Infante-Green. Responses due by 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Sullivan, Paul)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul V. Sullivan on behalf of Council on Elementry and Secondary Education, Angelica Infante-Green (Sullivan, Paul)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
February 16, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by First Student, Inc..(Hultman, Kristina)
February 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by First Student, Inc..(Hultman, Kristina)
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina I. Hultman on behalf of First Student, Inc. (Hultman, Kristina)
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina I. Hultman on behalf of First Student, Inc. (Hultman, Kristina)
February 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Hilton on behalf of North Kingstown School Department (Hilton, Kathleen)
February 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Hilton on behalf of North Kingstown School Department (Hilton, Kathleen)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by North Kingstown School Department.(Hilton, Kathleen)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by North Kingstown School Department.(Hilton, Kathleen)
February 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of North Kingstown School Department (DeSisto, Marc)
February 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of North Kingstown School Department (DeSisto, Marc)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0513. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1593952, filed by North Kingstown School Department. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hilton, Kathleen)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0513. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1593952, filed by North Kingstown School Department. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hilton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traghella et al v. North Kingstown School Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Kingstown School Department
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelica Infante-Green
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean State Transit, LLC.
Represented By: Amanda R.k
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina I. Hultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Council on Elementry and Secondary Education
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Traghella
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Traghella
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?