Glascoff et al v. Laviano
Plaintiff: Andrew B. Glascoff, Timothy C. Glascoff and Matthew B. Glascoff
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Jeffrey Laviano
3Rd Party Defendant: Susan Titus Glascoff
Case Number: 1:2021cv00096
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall L. Souza on behalf of Jeffrey Laviano (Souza, Randall)
April 9, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS filed by All Defendants. (Kelly, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE In Opposition to #14 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey Laviano. Replies due by 4/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Supporting Memo, #3 Exhibit B to Supporting Memo)(Kelly, Michael)
March 26, 2021 Filing 17 Third Party Defendant, Susan Titus Glascoff ANSWER to Complaint of Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff, Jeffrey Laviano by Susan Titus Glascoff.(D'Amico, Robert)
March 26, 2021 Filing 16 Plaintiffs' Reply to Counterclaim of Defendant, Jeffrey Laviano by Andrew B. Glascoff. (D'Amico, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Laviano. Susan Titus Glascoff served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Kelly, Michael)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew B. Glascoff, Matthew B. Glascoff, Susan Titus Glascoff, Timothy C. Glascoff. Responses due by 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(D'Amico, Robert)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. D'Amico, II on behalf of Susan Titus Glascoff (D'Amico, Robert)
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Jeffrey Laviano (Kelly, Michael)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Susan Titus Glascoff. (Potter, Carrie)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Request filed by Jeffrey Laviano. (Kelly, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeffrey Laviano. (Resnick, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Resnick on behalf of Jeffrey Laviano (Resnick, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Susan Titus Glascoff, filed by Jeffrey Laviano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kelly, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Jeffrey Laviano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kelly, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Andrew B. Glascoff . (D'Amico, Robert)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew B. Glascoff. Jeffrey Laviano served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (D'Amico, Robert)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Laviano. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1598250 ), filed by Timothy Glascoff, Matthew Glascoff, Andrew Glascoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, #7 Summons)(D'Amico, Robert) (Attachment 6 replaced on 3/2/2021) (Smith, Rana).
March 1, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glascoff et al v. Laviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew B. Glascoff
Represented By: Patrick F. Dowling, Jr.
Represented By: Robert A. D'Amico, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy C. Glascoff
Represented By: Patrick F. Dowling, Jr.
Represented By: Robert A. D'Amico, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew B. Glascoff
Represented By: Patrick F. Dowling, Jr.
Represented By: Robert A. D'Amico, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jeffrey Laviano
Represented By: Michael A. Kelly
Represented By: Randall L. Souza
Represented By: Michael D. Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Susan Titus Glascoff
Represented By: Robert A. D'Amico, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?