Curran v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Curran
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Secant Medical, Inc., Secant Medical, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00105
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-05755. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
March 4, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-05755. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
April 20, 2020 Filing 26 Copy of Order/Notice dated 3/16/20 (Document # 23 & 24) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to SECANT MEDICAL for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. (rf, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 25 Copy of Order dated 3/6/20 (Document # 21) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to SECANT MEDICAL, LLC for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. (lvj, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT CURRAN'S MOTION TO REMAND IS DENIED. DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED AS TO THE REQUEST TO TRANSFER VENUE & DENIED AS MOOT IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. THE CASE IS TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1404(a) TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF RHODE ISLAND; & THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF RHODE ISLAND WITH THE COMPLETE CASEFILE & MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/16/20. 3/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/16/20. 3/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (ECF NO. 20) IS GRANTED & EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF 3/5/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/6/20.3/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 22 Supplemental Authority, filed by DEFTS ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (kw, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
February 19, 2020 Copy of Order/Notice dated 2/4/20 (Document #17) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Secant Medical, Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. (kw, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by VIRGINIA CURRAN. (QUIRK, MICHAEL)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (ECF NO. 16) IS GRANTED, & EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF 1/24/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 2/4/20.2/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 EXHIBIT A (SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY), filed by DEFTS ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (kw, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judge Baylson Decision, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN on behalf of ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(FLYNN, MOLLY)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. MERK on behalf of ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MERK, MELISSA)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 Reply in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. D - Order Aug. 2014, #2 Exhibit Ex. E - PL Response, #3 Exhibit Ex. F - Order Feb. 2019, #4 Exhibit Ex. G - Order March 2019)(CALLSEN, JULIE) Modified on 1/7/2020 (tjd).
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (DOC. #8 ) IS GRANTED, AND EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF TUESDAY 12/24/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/2/2020.1/2/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VIRGINIA CURRAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-state court order)(QUIRK, MICHAEL)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by VIRGINIA CURRAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-state court motion, #2 Exhibit B-state court opposition, #3 Exhibit C-state court order, #4 Exhibit D-unpublished state court opinion, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(QUIRK, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/31/2019 (tjd).
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (sg, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A. - Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Plaintiff Response Document, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit)(CALLSEN, JULIE)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VIRGINIA CURRAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-Unpublished Court Opinion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUIRK, MICHAEL)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. QUIRK on behalf of VIRGINIA CURRAN with Certificate of Service(QUIRK, MICHAEL)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON & JOHNSON for ETHICON, INC.. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(bw, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191000667. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207911)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curran v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Julie A. Callsen
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: Molly Elizabeth Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secant Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secant Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Julie A. Callsen
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: Molly Elizabeth Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Curran
Represented By: Michael J. Quirk
Represented By: Esther Berezofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?