Trisha P. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Trisha Palin
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00108
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Henry on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Henry, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 3/30/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
March 29, 2021 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 4/12/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/29/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Trisha Palin. (Maguire, Stephen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Trisha Palin. (Maguire, Stephen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Trisha Palin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons.GenCounsel, #3 Summons.Rosen, #4 Summons.Saul, #5 Summons.Weisman)(Maguire, Stephen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Trisha Palin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons.GenCounsel, #3 Summons.Rosen, #4 Summons.Saul, #5 Summons.Weisman)(Maguire, Stephen)
March 5, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
March 5, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trisha P. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Michael L. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Palin
Represented By: Stephen P. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?