Smith v. Roger Williams Law School et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Smith
Defendant: American Bar Association, United States Department of Education, Roger Williams Law School, Olivia Milonas, Jenna Wims Hashway, Francis X Flaherty, Michael Yelonsky, Jonathan Gutoff, William E. Smith, Jared Goldstein and Tanya Monesteir
Case Number: 1:2021cv00133
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
2 Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
3 Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: All pending motions are denied without prejudice. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge who shall hold a status conference and establish a schedule for the filing of pretrial motions. The status conference shall be held within the next 7 days. No further motions shall be filed until the status conference is held. - So Ordered by District Judge Paul J. Barbadoro on 5/17/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 14, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE In Opposition to #19 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant's, #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants, #14 MOTION For the Clerk to Enter Default , #25 MOTION for Relief filed by United States Department of Education. Replies due by 5/21/2021. (Romero, Amy)
May 10, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE In Opposition to #29 MOTION for an Extension of Time filed by Roger Williams Law School. Replies due by 5/17/2021. (Richard, Steven)
May 10, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for an Extension of Time filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGuire, Vickie)
May 6, 2021 Filing 28 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Jimmy Smith in support of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE In Opposition to #25 MOTION for Relief filed by Roger Williams Law School. Replies due by 5/13/2021. (Richard, Steven)
May 6, 2021 Filing 26 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Jimmy Smith in support of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Relief filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2021 Filing 24 Letter sent to Jimmy Smith requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is hereby ordered to serve the plaintiffs summons and complaint on the defendants - So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone on 5/6/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 4, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE In Opposition to #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roger Williams Law School. Replies due by 5/11/2021. (Richard, Steven)
May 4, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
May 3, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE In Opposition to #20 MOTION to Strike #18 Response to Motion , #19 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant's filed by Roger Williams Law School. Replies due by 5/10/2021. (Richard, Steven)
May 3, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #18 Response to Motion filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
May 3, 2021 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant's filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Email)(McGuire, Vickie)
May 3, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION to Dismiss /Strike filed by Roger Williams Law School. Replies due by 5/10/2021. (Richard, Steven)
May 3, 2021 Filing 17 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Jimmy Smith in support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss /Strike. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Email)(McGuire, Vickie)
May 3, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss /Strike filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email)(Potter, Carrie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE In Opposition to #14 MOTION For the Clerk to Enter Default filed by Roger Williams Law School. Replies due by 5/7/2021. (Richard, Steven)
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION For the Clerk to Enter Default filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Email)(Potter, Carrie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE In Opposition to #12 Amended MOTION to Strike #10 Response to Motion,, filed by Roger Williams Law School. Replies due by 5/7/2021. (Richard, Steven)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Strike #10 Response to Motion,, filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #10 Response to Motion,, filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE In Opposition to #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants (filed by RWU Law School and also on behalf of RWU Law School Affiliated Defendants who have yet to be served with process) filed by Roger Williams Law School. Replies due by 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Request to Waive Service Dated 3/19/21, #2 Exhibit B: RWU Law School's Executed Waiver of Service Dated 4/1/21, #3 Exhibit C: 4/5/21 Communication to Plaintiff Re: Executed Waiver of Service)(Richard, Steven)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by Jimmy Smith. Responses due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER - So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B McCafferty on 4/13/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONCURRING ORDER accepting this case for referral to the District of New Hampshire for assignment by designation. Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro and Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone - So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B McCafferty on 4/13/2021(Barletta, Barbara)
April 14, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 14, 2021 Case reassigned to District Judge Paul J. Barbadoro and Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone; District Judge Mary S. McElroy, Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond no longer assigned to the case (Barletta, Barbara)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL by all Judges in this District and transferring this case to the District of New Hampshire for assignment by designation -- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/9/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Bar Association, Roger Williams Law School, United States Department of Education, Jared Goldstein, Tanya Monesteir, Jonathan Gutoff, Olivia Milonas, Jenna Wims Hashway, Michael Yelonsky, William E. Smith, Francis X Flaherty, filed by Jimmy Smith.(Hicks, Alyson)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of Roger Williams Law School (Richard, Steven)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Smith. (McGuire, Vickie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Smith. (McGuire, Vickie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jimmy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGuire, Vickie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jimmy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Roger Williams Law School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Williams Law School
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Milonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna Wims Hashway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis X Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Yelonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Gutoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Monesteir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?