Batista v. City of Providence et al
Plaintiff: Jose F. Batista
Defendant: Machiste Rankin, Kimberly Dy, Elise Swearingen, Deborah Wray, Phanida Phivilay, Michael Fontaine, Nicholas Figueroa, City of Providence, Susan DeRita, Kenneth Cohen and Providence External Review Authority Board
Case Number: 1:2021cv00138
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 6/11/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/4/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM deadline requested to extend to Friday, June 11, 2021 filed by Jose F. Batista. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Conley, William)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Should It Aid The Court filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/11/2021. (DiSanto, Megan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan K Maciasz DiSanto on behalf of All Defendants (DiSanto, Megan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(DiSanto, Megan)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose F. Batista of all Defendants (Conley, William)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/23/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/23/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1605576 ), filed by Jose Batista. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - PERA 6.1.20 Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - PERA Subpoena Request, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - PERA October 21 email, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - PERA 10.28.20 Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - PERA 11.9.20 Response, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 Executive Order, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 100 Person Limit, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 Job Description, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 PVD Comm Relations Act, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 PERA Ordinance, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 PERA Investigation, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(Conley, William)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1605576 ), filed by Jose Batista. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - PERA 6.1.20 Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - PERA Subpoena Request, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - PERA October 21 email, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - PERA 10.28.20 Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - PERA 11.9.20 Response, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 Executive Order, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 100 Person Limit, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 Job Description, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 PVD Comm Relations Act, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 PERA Ordinance, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 PERA Investigation, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(Conley, William)
March 23, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 23, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batista v. City of Providence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machiste Rankin
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Dy
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise Swearingen
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Wray
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phanida Phivilay
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fontaine
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Figueroa
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Providence
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan DeRita
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cohen
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence External Review Authority Board
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F. Batista
Represented By: William J. Conley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?