HDI Global Specialty SE v. J.R. Vinagro Corporation et al
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Defendant: Kyle G. Lewis, Kevin D. Matney, Aetna Bridge Co., J.R. Vinagro Corporation, Matthew P. Darrigo and Alejandro J. Cano
Case Number: 1:2021cv00166
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Bridge Co., Alejandro J. Cano, Matthew P. Darrigo, J.R. Vinagro Corporation, Kyle G. Lewis, Kevin D. Matney.(Nugent, Mark)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. Alejandro J. Cano served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Cantor, Paul)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation Extending Time. Aetna Bridge Co. answer due 6/11/2021; Alejandro J. Cano answer due 6/11/2021; Matthew P. Darrigo answer due 6/11/2021; J.R. Vinagro Corporation answer due 6/11/2021; Kyle G. Lewis answer due 6/11/2021; Kevin D. Matney answer due 6/11/2021. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/18/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. Matthew P. Darrigo served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Cantor, Paul)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Late Answer filed by All Defendants. (Nugent, Mark)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. Kevin D. Matney served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Cantor, Paul)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. Kyle G. Lewis served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Cantor, Paul)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. Aetna Bridge Co. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Cantor, Paul)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. J.R. Vinagro Corporation served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Cantor, Paul)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aetna Bridge Co., Alejandro J. Cano, Matthew P. Darrigo, J.R. Vinagro Corporation, Kyle G. Lewis, Kevin D. Matney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aetna Bridge Co., Alejandro J. Cano, Matthew P. Darrigo, J.R. Vinagro Corporation, Kyle G. Lewis, Kevin D. Matney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1614334 ), filed by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit contract upon which claims are founded, #2 Exhibit Proof of Loss and check evidencing paayment to insured, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Vinagro, #5 Summons Aetna, #6 Summons Darrigo, #7 Summons Cano, #8 Summons Lewis, #9 Summons Matney)(Cantor, Paul)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1614334 ), filed by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit contract upon which claims are founded, #2 Exhibit Proof of Loss and check evidencing paayment to insured, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Vinagro, #5 Summons Aetna, #6 Summons Darrigo, #7 Summons Cano, #8 Summons Lewis, #9 Summons Matney)(Cantor, Paul)
April 13, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
April 13, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI Global Specialty SE v. J.R. Vinagro Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle G. Lewis
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D. Matney
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Bridge Co.
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. Vinagro Corporation
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew P. Darrigo
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro J. Cano
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Paul S. Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?