Lewiss v. Royal Health Group, et el
Plaintiff: Royal Health Group, Mamary, Inc., ROYAL WESTERLY, LLC d/b/a ROYAL OF WESTERLY NURSING CENTER, Matthew Lewiss and Anthony R Leone, II
Defendant: Matthew Lewiss, Esq. Executor, on behalf of the Estate of Edna Chapman, Estate of Edna Chapman and Royal Westerly, LLC doing business as Westerly Nursing Home
Case Number: 1:2021cv00182
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 15 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Leone, Anthony)
June 15, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference RESCHEDULED for 6/22/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. The dial-in information previously sent to counsel remains the same. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 3:20 PM before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. The court will send dial-in information to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER withdrawing #8 Motion to Strike; granting #13 Motion to Withdraw - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/18/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw #8 MOTION to Strike filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/28/2021. (Benner, Melissa) Modified on 5/14/2021 (Simoncelli, Michael).
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 First RESPONSE In Opposition to #8 MOTION to Strike Paragraph 30 from Complaint filed by Anthony R Leone, II. Replies due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memo in support of Plaintiffs' Objection)(Leone, Anthony)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Royal Westerly, LLC.(Benner, Melissa)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Royal Health Group.(Benner, Melissa)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Mamary, Inc..(Benner, Melissa)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike filed by Royal Westerly, LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law)(Benner, Melissa)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Index)(McGuire, Vickie)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
April 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mamary, Inc.. (Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mamary, Inc.. (Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Health Group. (Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Health Group. (Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROYAL WESTERLY, LLC d/b/a ROYAL OF WESTERLY NURSING CENTER. (Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROYAL WESTERLY, LLC d/b/a ROYAL OF WESTERLY NURSING CENTER. (Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Health Group. (Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Health Group. (Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2021-0054. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1617960, filed by ROYAL WESTERLY, LLC d/b/a ROYAL OF WESTERLY NURSING CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Benner, Melissa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2021-0054. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1617960, filed by ROYAL WESTERLY, LLC d/b/a ROYAL OF WESTERLY NURSING CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Benner, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewiss v. Royal Health Group, et el
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Health Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamary, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROYAL WESTERLY, LLC d/b/a ROYAL OF WESTERLY NURSING CENTER
Represented By: Melissa C. Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lewiss
Represented By: Anthony R. Leone, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R Leone, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lewiss, Esq. Executor, on behalf of the Estate of Edna Chapman, Estate of Edna Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Westerly, LLC doing business as Westerly Nursing Home
Represented By: Melissa C. Benner
Represented By: Sheri L. Pizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?