DeCristofaro v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dianne DeCristofaro
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc. and Life Insurance Company of North America doing business as CIGNA Group Insurance
Case Number: 1:2021cv00184
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Stipulation filed by Citizens Financial Group, Inc. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. answer due 7/2/2021. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 6/21/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Citizens Financial Group, Inc.. (Bassett, Casey)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Magratten, Brooks)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. answer due 6/18/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/20/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION filed by Citizens Financial Group, Inc.. (Bassett, Casey)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation. Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 6/18/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/11/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Magratten, Brooks)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Magratten, Brooks)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks R. Magratten on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Magratten, Brooks)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dianne DeCristofaro. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Kilpatrick, J.)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dianne DeCristofaro. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Kilpatrick, J.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
April 26, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1618376 ), filed by Dianne DeCristofaro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Citizens Summons, #3 LINA Summons)(Kilpatrick, J.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1618376 ), filed by Dianne DeCristofaro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Citizens Summons, #3 LINA Summons)(Kilpatrick, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeCristofaro v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America doing business as CIGNA Group Insurance
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne DeCristofaro
Represented By: J. Scott Kilpatrick
Represented By: Mason J. Waring
Represented By: Leah F. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?