Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB v. Tourgee et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB doing business as Christiana Trust not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for Bantam Funding Trust 2018-1
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Rhode Island Division of Taxation, Mark D. Tourgee, United States of America and Asset Acceptance, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00232
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian W. Tracy on behalf of Mark D. Tourgee (Tracy, Christian)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian W. Tracy on behalf of Mark D. Tourgee (Tracy, Christian)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Mark D. Tourgee.(Tracy, Christian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Santolucito, Thomas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. United States of America served on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Santolucito, Thomas) Modified on 6/22/2021 to correct event type and answer date(Potter, Carrie).
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. United States of America served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Santolucito, Thomas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Rhode Island Division of Taxation served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Santolucito, Thomas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Santolucito, Thomas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Midland Funding, LLC served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Santolucito, Thomas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Mark D. Tourgee served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Santolucito, Thomas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Asset Acceptance, LLC served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Santolucito, Thomas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB D/B/A Christiana Trust not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for Bantam Funding Trust 2018-1. (Santolucito, Thomas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB D/B/A Christiana Trust not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for Bantam Funding Trust 2018-1. (Santolucito, Thomas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1628364 ), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB D/B/A Christiana Trust not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for Bantam Funding Trust 2018-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons, #7 summons, #8 summons)(Santolucito, Thomas) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened version on 5/26/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1628364 ), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB D/B/A Christiana Trust not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for Bantam Funding Trust 2018-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons, #7 summons, #8 summons)(Santolucito, Thomas) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened version on 5/26/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).
May 26, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 26, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB v. Tourgee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Division of Taxation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Tourgee
Represented By: Christian W. Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB doing business as Christiana Trust not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for Bantam Funding Trust 2018-1
Represented By: Thomas J. Santolucito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?