Pepper v. Brown University et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas J. Pepper
Defendant: Sheila Coleman and Brown University
Case Number: 1:2021cv00248
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Brown University answer due 9/3/2021; Sheila Coleman answer due 9/3/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/29/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/10/2021. (Edwards, Mitchell)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Pagliarini on behalf of All Defendants (Pagliarini, Thomas)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell R. Edwards on behalf of Brown University, Sheila Coleman (Edwards, Mitchell)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 Process Return and Receipt Executed by United States Marshal, SUMMONS Returned Executed Brown University served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; Sheila Coleman served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Nicholas J. Pepper. (Potter, Carrie)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summons and USM-285 forwarded to the USMS. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285)(Potter, Carrie)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Nicholas J. Pepper. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285)(Potter, Carrie)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Letter sent to Nicholas J. Pepper requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is hereby ordered to serve the plaintiffs summons and complaint on the defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 6/10/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
June 9, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicholas J. Pepper. (Potter, Carrie)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicholas J. Pepper. (Potter, Carrie)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicholas J. Pepper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/8/2021) (Potter, Carrie).
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicholas J. Pepper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/8/2021) (Potter, Carrie).
June 8, 2021 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
June 8, 2021 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepper v. Brown University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas J. Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Coleman
Represented By: Mitchell R. Edwards
Represented By: Thomas J. Pagliarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: Mitchell R. Edwards
Represented By: Thomas J. Pagliarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?