Washington Trust Company v. Caramadre et al
Plaintiff: Washington Trust Company
Defendant: Joseph A. Caramadre, United States, Paula M. Caramadre, Transamerica Life Insurance Company and Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio
Case Number: 1:2021cv00274
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Crossclaim,,, by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio.(Magratten, Brooks)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio.(Magratten, Brooks)
July 23, 2021 Filing 14 United States' ANSWER to Crossclaim by Paula Caramadre by United States. (Rogers, Mary)
July 23, 2021 Filing 13 United States' ANSWER to Crossclaim by Transamerican and Western Reserve Crossclaims by United States. (Rogers, Mary)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio and Transamerica Life Insurance Company by Paula M. Caramadre. (West, George)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Crossclaim Of the United States of America by Paula M. Caramadre. (West, George)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader, CROSSCLAIM against Joseph A. Caramadre, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, United States, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio by Paula M. Caramadre.(West, George)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George J. West on behalf of Paula M. Caramadre (West, George)
July 11, 2021 Filing 8 United States' ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Joseph A. Caramadre, Paula M. Caramadre, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio by United States.(Rogers, Mary)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. (Magratten, Brooks)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Joseph A. Caramadre, Paula M. Caramadre, United States by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Transamerica Life Insurance Company.(Magratten, Brooks)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio (Fitzpatrick, David)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks R. Magratten on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio (Magratten, Brooks)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-04065. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Interpleader, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-04065. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Interpleader, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)
June 28, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 28, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Trust Company v. Caramadre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Caramadre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula M. Caramadre
Represented By: George J. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Represented By: David R. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Represented By: David R. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Trust Company
Represented By: Americo M. Scungio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?