Labreche v. Brouillette
Plaintiff: John Labreche
Defendant: Richard Brouillette
Case Number: 1:2021cv00277
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Richard Brouillette. (Lapatin, Stephen)
August 2, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Richard Brouillette answer due 8/27/2021; and Entering #6 Stipulation filed by Richard Brouillette (Jackson, Ryan)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION filed by Richard Brouillette. (Lapatin, Stephen)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Lapatin on behalf of Richard Brouillette (Lapatin, Stephen)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Richard Brouillette. (Potter, Carrie)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by John Labreche. (Formisano, V.)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Smith, Rana)
June 30, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Smith, Rana)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1639989 ), filed by John Labreche. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1639989 ), filed by John Labreche. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labreche v. Brouillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Brouillette
Represented By: Stephen D. Lapatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Labreche
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Jessica A. Roberge
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?