Peoples v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lydia C. Peoples
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00326
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Consenting to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Almond. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/3/2021. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Parrington on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Parrington, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 8/26/2021. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 8/26/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.The defendant shall have up to and including 10/12/2021 to enter an appearance and either file a dispositive motion or the Certified Administrative Record which shall be deemed an answer (general denial) to the plaintiff's complaint as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(b)(3). (McGuire, Vickie)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/11/2021. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
August 10, 2021 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Karl E. Osterhout filed by Kerin M. Woods. - So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/10/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1652734 ) filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1652734 ) filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerin M. Woods on behalf of Lydia C. Peoples (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerin M. Woods on behalf of Lydia C. Peoples (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Kerin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Lydia C. Peoples. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Kerin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia C. Peoples
Represented By: Kerin M. Woods
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kevin M. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?