Reinauer Transportation Companies, LLC et al v. Sandberg Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reinauer Transportation Companies, LLC and Senesco Marine, LLC
Defendant: Sandberg Enterprises, Inc. and Thordon Bearings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00330
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sandberg Enterprises, Inc.. (Bengtson, C.)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Sandberg Enterprises, Inc..(Bengtson, C.) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/24/2021) (Kenny, Meghan).
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Russell Bengtson on behalf of Sandberg Enterprises, Inc. (Bengtson, C.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reinauer Transportation Companies, LLC. Sandberg Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Finan, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sandberg Enterprises, Inc. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Reinauer Transportation Companies, LLC. (Finan, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
August 11, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1653314 ), filed by Reinauer Transportation Companies, LLC, Senesco Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finan, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1653314 ), filed by Reinauer Transportation Companies, LLC, Senesco Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finan, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinauer Transportation Companies, LLC et al v. Sandberg Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinauer Transportation Companies, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Finan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senesco Marine, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Finan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandberg Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: C. Russell Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thordon Bearings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?