Edwin L v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Edwin Lopez
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00359
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER:The Plaintiff shall have up to and including 11/18/2021 to file a Motion to Modify, Reverse, or Remand the Decision of the Commissioner. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/19/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Bolen on behalf of Social Security Administration (Bolen, Timothy)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 9/23/2021. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 9/23/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 9/10/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/9/2021. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 9, 2021 Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond no longer assigned to the case as the presider. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edwin Lopez. (Salomon, Nora)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Edwin Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salomon, Nora)
September 8, 2021 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwin L v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Lopez
Represented By: Nora Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Timothy S. Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?