Louth v. NFL Enterprises LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel Louth
Defendant: NFL Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00405
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NFL Enterprises LLC identifying Corporate Parent NFL Ventures, L.P. for NFL Enterprises LLC.. (Taveras, Angel)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by NFL Enterprises LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2021. (Taveras, Angel)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Angel Taveras on behalf of NFL Enterprises LLC (Taveras, Angel)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Set/Reset Deadlines: NFL Enterprises LLC answer due 12/13/2021. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/26/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Louth. NFL Enterprises LLC served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Prignano, Stephen)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Max Roberts. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/8/2021. (DaCruz, Kayla)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Max Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1675009 ) filed by Daniel Louth. (Prignano, Stephen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NFL Enterprises LLC. (Kenny, Meghan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1673779 ), filed by Daniel Louth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Prignano, Stephen)
October 5, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louth v. NFL Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Louth
Represented By: Stephen M. Prignano
Represented By: Max Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Angel Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?