International Game Technology PLC et al v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: International Game Technology PLC and IGT Global Solutions Corporation
Defendant: Merrick B Garland and The U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2021cv00463
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 2/2/2022. (Goodnature, Taisa)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Reset Deadlines: Merrick B Garland answer due 2/23/2021; The U.S. Department of Justice answer due 2/23/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/19/2022. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Game Technology PLC, IGT Global Solutions Corporation. The U.S. Department of Justice served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Hichar, Mark)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Game Technology PLC, IGT Global Solutions Corporation. Merrick B Garland served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Hichar, Mark)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Merrick B Garland, The U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Merrick B Garland, The U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark N.G. Hichar on behalf of IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC (Hichar, Mark)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark N.G. Hichar on behalf of IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC (Hichar, Mark)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Joshua Fougere to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690078 ) filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Joshua Fougere to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690078 ) filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Jonathan F. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690075 ) filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Jonathan F. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690075 ) filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Daniel J. Hay to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690070 ) filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Daniel J. Hay to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690070 ) filed by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC identifying Corporate Parent IGT Lottery S.p.A. for IGT Global Solutions Corporation; Corporate Parent De Agosrini S.p.A. for International Game Technology PLC.. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IGT Global Solutions Corporation, International Game Technology PLC identifying Corporate Parent IGT Lottery S.p.A. for IGT Global Solutions Corporation; Corporate Parent De Agosrini S.p.A. for International Game Technology PLC.. (Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690060 ), filed by International Game Technology PLC, IGT Global Solutions Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1690060 ), filed by International Game Technology PLC, IGT Global Solutions Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fixler, David)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Hay. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 11/23/2021. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan F. Cohn. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 11/23/2021. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan F. Cohn. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 11/23/2021. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Fougere. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 11/23/2021. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Fougere. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 11/23/2021. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Hay. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 11/23/2021. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Game Technology PLC et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Game Technology PLC
Represented By: Daniel Hay
Represented By: Joshua Fougere
Represented By: Mark N.G. Hichar
Represented By: David C. Fixler
Represented By: Jonathan F. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IGT Global Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Hay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Cohn
Represented By: Joshua Fougere
Represented By: Mark N.G. Hichar
Represented By: David C. Fixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Taisa M. Goodnature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Taisa M. Goodnature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?