Silvia v. Office of the Attorney General of Rhode Island et al
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Defendant: Office of the Attorney General of Rhode Island, Providence VA Medical Center and Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 1:2021cv00486
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint And Motion to Substitute USA filed by Providence VA Medical Center. Responses due by 2/22/2022. (Kane, Leslie)
February 7, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM to Address Information Pertaining to Claim by David A. Silvia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email)(DaCruz, Kayla) Modified on 2/7/2022 CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (DaCruz, Kayla).
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION "for court to address subpoena" filed by David A. Silvia. Responses due by 2/17/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 2, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM to Address Information Pertaining to Claim by David A. Silvia (Attachments: #1 Email)(DaCruz, Kayla)
January 26, 2022 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 26, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Department of Veteran Affairs, Providence VA Medical Center, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kenny, Meghan)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Amended/add "Department of Veteran Affairs, Office of General Counsel" re: #1 Complaint; plaintiff is directed to file his Amended Complaint within 10 days of receipt of this Text Order. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/26/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed on the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Rhode Island (Simoncelli, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend Complaint to "add the Department of Veteran Affairs, Office of General Counsel a Defendant" re: #1 Complaint filed by David A. Silvia. Responses due by 2/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons and USM for proposed party)
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM to Address Information Pertaining to Claim by David A. Silvia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DaCruz, Kayla) Modified on 1/12/2022 CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (DaCruz, Kayla).
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by David A. Silvia (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David A. Silvia. Providence VA Medical Center served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #10 MOTION "in objection to denying case move to mediation." As soon as the defendants file a responsive pleading in this case, the court will hold a status conference to decide how best to proceed with the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/4/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION "in objection to denying case move to mediation" re: Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by David A. Silvia. Responses due by 1/18/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #8 MOTION to refer to mediation. The Defendants have not yet answered the complaint, so the request for mediation is premature. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/3/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 Memorandum to Address Information Pertaining to Claim by David A. Silvia (DaCruz, Kayla) Modified on 12/27/2021 CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (DaCruz, Kayla).
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to refer to mediation filed by David A. Silvia. Responses due by 1/3/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Providence VA Medical Center. (DaCruz, Kayla)
December 17, 2021 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #7 Summons Issued. Summons and USM have been forwarded to the Marshalls office for serving. (DaCruz, Kayla)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #6 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is DENIED. Pursuant to Section 1951, the Court has reviewed this pro se complaint. Because the Complaint does not plausibly allege any justiciable claims against Defendant "USAG, for the State of RI", that Defendant is dismissed from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/16/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by David A. Silvia. Responses due by 12/29/2021. (DaCruz, Kayla)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 Letter sent to David A. Silvia requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Kenny, Meghan)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by David A. Silvia. (DaCruz, Kayla)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to Section 1951, the Court has reviewed this pro se complaint. Because the Complaint does not show any allegations against Defendant "US Attorney General for R.I.", that Defendant is dismissed from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The action may proceed against "Providence VAMC." The United States Marshals Service is hereby ordered to serve the plaintiffs summons and complaint on the defendant. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/13/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 13, 2021 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA21-259; this case is permanently assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Jackson, Ryan)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
December 10, 2021 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 21-cv-259 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (DaCruz, Kayla)
December 10, 2021 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 21-cv-259 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia v. Office of the Attorney General of Rhode Island et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Attorney General of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence VA Medical Center
Represented By: Leslie J. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?