O'Connor et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper) et al
Plaintiff: Karen M. O'Connor, Joseph Inderlin, Robert C. Jencks, Lori M. Kuhn, Dorinda A. Dupree, Dolores Ann Means, Christopher Heon, Glen Blanchette, Jennifer M. Terrian, James P. Terrian, Jane Coderre, Shannon K. Sacchetti, Lisa Davis, Roger Alix and Allan, on behalf of themselves and all others so s A. Spooner
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper), Federal National Mortgage Association, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2022cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper). Responses due by 3/17/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Set/Reset Deadlines: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation & Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 4/4/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/3/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Karen M. O'Connor.(Dion, Todd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint including all additional parties by February 11, 2022; Defendants Nationstar, Fannie Mae, and Freddie Mac shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before March 4, 2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/10/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper). Responses due by 2/18/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Order Entering #9 STIPULATION. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/11/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
January 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation answer due 2/9/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper). Responses due by 1/24/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Ankrom on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper) (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle Guillory Tadesse on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper) (Tadesse, Krystle)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr. on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper) (Farside, Joseph)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation answer due 2/4/2022; Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 2/4/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/10/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 appeal index from state record)(Kenny, Meghan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2021-1037. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1702465, filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2021-1037. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1702465, filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 3, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 3, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M. O'Connor
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Inderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Jencks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori M. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorinda A. Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Ann Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Heon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Blanchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer M. Terrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Terrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Coderre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon K. Sacchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Alix
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan, on behalf of themselves and all others so s A. Spooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (n/k/a Mr. Cooper)
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?