Pacia v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5
Plaintiff: Richard A. Pacia
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5
Case Number: 1:2022cv00014
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5 in support of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5. Responses due by 3/17/2022. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Set/Reset Deadlines: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company answer due 3/3/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/23/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5. Responses due by 3/3/2022. (Murphy, Joseph)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set Deadlines/Hearings: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company answer due 2/17/2022.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/19/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Copmlaint filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5. Responses due by 2/1/2022. (Murphy, Joseph)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Murphy on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5 (Murphy, Joseph)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 11, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5 identifying Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG, Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5.. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5 identifying Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG, Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5.. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5 (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5 (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-07467. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1707159, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-07467. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1707159, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacia v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Pacia
Represented By: Corey J. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Joseph P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?