Franks v. The Cooper Companies. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Franks
Defendant: The Cooper Companies. Inc., Coopersurgical, Inc., Utah Medical Products, Inc. and Femcare, Ltd. - UK Subsidiary of Utah Medical Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00046
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler J. Pare on behalf of Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies. Inc. (Pare, Tyler)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicole Franks. Utah Medical Products, Inc. waiver sent on 2/25/2022, answer due 4/26/2022. (Purnell, Simon)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Robert G. Smith, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1730334 ) filed by Utah Medical Products, Inc.. (Ruggieri, James)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler J. Pare on behalf of Utah Medical Products, Inc. (Pare, Tyler)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Ruggieri on behalf of Utah Medical Products, Inc. (Ruggieri, James)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Ruggieri on behalf of Utah Medical Products, Inc. (Ruggieri, James)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert G Smith, Jr.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/7/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Daniel R. Griffin, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1715559 ) filed by Nicole Franks. (Hultquist, Christopher)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Simon B. Purnell, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1715557 ) filed by Nicole Franks. (Hultquist, Christopher)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Femcare, Ltd. - UK Subsidiary of Utah Medical Products, Inc.. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Utah Medical Products, Inc.. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Coopersurgical, Inc.. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Cooper Companies. Inc.. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Simon B Purnell. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/28/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R Griffin. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/28/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1715100 ), filed by Nicole Franks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, Summons-CooperSurgical, Inc., #3 Exhibit 2, Summons-The Cooper Companies, Inc., #4 Exhibit 3, Summons-Femcare, Ltd. -UK Subsidiary of Utah Medical Products, Inc., #5 Exhibit 4, Summons-Utah Medical Products, Inc.)(Hultquist, Christopher)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1715100 ), filed by Nicole Franks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, Summons-CooperSurgical, Inc., #3 Exhibit 2, Summons-The Cooper Companies, Inc., #4 Exhibit 3, Summons-Femcare, Ltd. -UK Subsidiary of Utah Medical Products, Inc., #5 Exhibit 4, Summons-Utah Medical Products, Inc.)(Hultquist, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franks v. The Cooper Companies. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Franks
Represented By: Christopher E Hultquist
Represented By: Daniel R Griffin
Represented By: Simon Brian Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies. Inc.
Represented By: Tyler J. Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler J. Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Medical Products, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Ruggieri
Represented By: Robert G Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler J. Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Femcare, Ltd. - UK Subsidiary of Utah Medical Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?