Mejia Vaquerano v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Field Office Dir. Adam N Bergeron
Case Number: 1:2022cv00053
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/1/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER : The parties are hereby directed to fie a Joint Status Report on or before 7/1/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/1/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
March 31, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 4/14/2022. (Romero, Amy)
March 31, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Retsinas Romero on behalf of All Defendants (Romero, Amy)
March 11, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano. Adam N Bergeron served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Drago, Anthony)
March 11, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano. Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas served on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Drago, Anthony)
March 11, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 2/17/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Drago, Anthony)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney General and United States Attorney General for the District of Rhode Island. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Request filed by Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano. (Olen, Randy)
February 14, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Request filed by Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano. (Olen, Randy)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Adam N Bergeron. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Drago, Jr. on behalf of Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano (Drago, Anthony)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony Drago, Jr. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/8/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Anthony Drago, Jr., Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1719855 ) filed by Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Olen, Randy)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adam N Bergeron, Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Kenny, Meghan)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
February 2, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1717276 ), filed by Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Olen, Randy)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1717276 ), filed by Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Olen, Randy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia Vaquerano v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Antonio Mejia Vaquerano
Represented By: Randy Olen
Represented By: Anthony Drago, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas
Represented By: Amy Retsinas Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Amy Retsinas Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Amy Retsinas Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. Adam N Bergeron
Represented By: Amy Retsinas Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?