Christina I. Santos et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Christina I. Santos, John M. Santos, Judith Ann Kraus and Denise L. Belanger
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00103
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC answer due 6/6/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/9/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Responses due by 5/20/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants answer due 5/6/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/11/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Responses due by 4/18/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2022 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (DaCruz, Kayla)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines: Anser due by 4/6/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/14/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer up to April 6, 2022 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper). Responses due by 3/25/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer up to April 6, 2022 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper). Responses due by 3/25/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper) identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper).. (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper) identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper).. (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper). Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper). Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Tadesse, Krystle)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2022-00652. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1732834, filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Property Assessments, #3 Notice to State Court of Removal)(Tadesse, Krystle)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2022-00652. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1732834, filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (NKA Mr. Cooper). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Property Assessments, #3 Notice to State Court of Removal)(Tadesse, Krystle)
March 11, 2022 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
March 11, 2022 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. Related Case Number 22-cv-02, 22-cv-20 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Kenny, Meghan)
March 11, 2022 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
March 11, 2022 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. Related Case Number 22-cv-02, 22-cv-20 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christina I. Santos et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina I. Santos
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Santos
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Ann Kraus
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise L. Belanger
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?