MMJ Internal Holdings Corp. et al v. Garland et al
Petitioner: MMJ International Holdings Corp., MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc. and MMJ Biopharma Labs, Inc.
Respondent: Merrick B Garland, Ann Milgram, Thomas Cook, Drug Enforcement Administration and Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2022cv00152
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #8 Reply to Response filed by All Defendants. (Solomon-Strauss, Hannah)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 6/2/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for an Extension of Time two-day extension of time to file reply filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 6/15/2022. (Solomon-Strauss, Hannah)
May 26, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #7 Response to Motion, filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc., MMJ Biopharma Labs, Inc., MMJ International Holdings Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sheehan, Megan)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and motion to dismiss the complaint filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 5/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Solomon-Strauss, Hannah)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Solomon-Strauss on behalf of All Defendants (Solomon-Strauss, Hannah)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc., MMJ Biopharma Labs, Inc., MMJ International Holdings Corp.. Responses due by 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memo with Exhibits)(Sheehan, Megan)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MMJ International Holdings Corp., MMJ Biopharma Labs, Inc., MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.. Thomas Cook served on 4/14/2022, answer due 6/13/2022; Department of Justice served on 4/18/2022, answer due 6/17/2022; Drug Enforcement Administration served on 4/15/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; Merrick B Garland served on 4/18/2022, answer due 6/17/2022; Ann Milgram served on 4/15/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Sheehan, Megan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thomas Cook, Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration, Merrick B Garland, Ann Milgram, Attorney General of the United States, and the United States Attorney for the District of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thomas Cook, Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration, Merrick B Garland, Ann Milgram, Attorney General of the United States, and the United States Attorney for the District of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1746402 ), filed by MMJ INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS CORP., MMJ BIOPHARMA LABS INC., MMJ BIOPHARMA CULTIVATION INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Sheehan, Megan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/11/2022) (McGuire, Vickie).
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1746402 ), filed by MMJ INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS CORP., MMJ BIOPHARMA LABS INC., MMJ BIOPHARMA CULTIVATION INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Sheehan, Megan)
April 8, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie)
April 8, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MMJ Internal Holdings Corp. et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MMJ International Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Megan E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MMJ Biopharma Cultivation, Inc.
Represented By: Megan E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MMJ Biopharma Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Megan E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Hannah Solomon-Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ann Milgram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?