Pierson v. GoLocalProv, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Pierson
Defendant: GoLocalProv, LLC, The Fenton Group, LLC and Cloudflare, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00219
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Pierson. Cloudflare, Inc. served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Wolman, Jay)
June 27, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Pierson. The Fenton Group, LLC served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Wolman, Jay)
June 27, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Pierson. GoLocalProv, LLC served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Wolman, Jay)
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by GoLocalProv, LLC, The Fenton Group, LLC.(Hemond, Nicholas) Modified on 6/24/2022 to correct docket text(DaCruz, Kayla).
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Kristen Pierson of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Only (Wolman, Jay)
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Kristen Pierson re Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (McAteer, Sean)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The motions for pro hac vice admission of Attorney Marc J. Randazza (ECF No. 4) and Attorney Jay M. Wolman (ECF No. 3) are granted. As to Attorney Wolman, the Court further conditions his admission on his review of Rhode Island ethical standards regarding appropriate conduct at depositions. As local counsel, Attorney Sean McAteer is reminded of his obligations as set forth in Local Rule LR Gen 204(d). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 6/15/2022. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Cloudflare, Inc., GoLocalProv, LLC, The Fenton Group, LLC. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Cloudflare, Inc., GoLocalProv, LLC, The Fenton Group, LLC. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by Kristen Pierson. (McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by Kristen Pierson. (McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Kristen Pierson. (McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Kristen Pierson. (McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Kristen Pierson. (McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Kristen Pierson. (McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Marc J. Randazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763968 ) filed by Kristen Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Marc J. Randazza)(McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Marc J. Randazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763968 ) filed by Kristen Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Marc J. Randazza)(McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Jay M. Wolman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763967 ) filed by Kristen Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jay M. Wolman)(McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Jay M. Wolman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763967 ) filed by Kristen Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jay M. Wolman)(McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kristen Pierson. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint,,,, . (McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kristen Pierson. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint,,,, . (McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763943 ), filed by Kristen Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - GoLocalProv Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - GoLocalProv Image, #4 Exhibit 4 - GoLocalProv Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - GoLocalProv Image, #6 Exhibit 6 - GoLocalProv Article, #7 Exhibit 7 -GoLocalProv Article, #8 Exhibit 8 - GoLocalProv Article, #9 Exhibit 9 - GoLocalProv Image, #10 Exhibit 10 - GoLocalProv Article, #11 Exhibit 11 - GoLocalProv Article, #12 Exhibit 12 - GoLocalProv Image, #13 Exhibit 13 - GoLocalProv Article, #14 Exhibit 14 - GoLocalProv Terms and Conditions, #15 Exhibit 15 - Cease and Desist Letter, #16 Exhibit 16 - DMCA Takedown Notice, #17 Exhibit 17 - Cloudflare Automatic Email Response, #18 Exhibit 18 - Second DMCA Takedown Notice, #19 Exhibit 19 - Cloudflare Automatic Email Response, #20 Exhibit 20 - DMCA Takedown Notices, #21 Exhibit 21 - Cloudflare Automatic Email Responses)(McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763943 ), filed by Kristen Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - GoLocalProv Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - GoLocalProv Image, #4 Exhibit 4 - GoLocalProv Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - GoLocalProv Image, #6 Exhibit 6 - GoLocalProv Article, #7 Exhibit 7 -GoLocalProv Article, #8 Exhibit 8 - GoLocalProv Article, #9 Exhibit 9 - GoLocalProv Image, #10 Exhibit 10 - GoLocalProv Article, #11 Exhibit 11 - GoLocalProv Article, #12 Exhibit 12 - GoLocalProv Image, #13 Exhibit 13 - GoLocalProv Article, #14 Exhibit 14 - GoLocalProv Terms and Conditions, #15 Exhibit 15 - Cease and Desist Letter, #16 Exhibit 16 - DMCA Takedown Notice, #17 Exhibit 17 - Cloudflare Automatic Email Response, #18 Exhibit 18 - Second DMCA Takedown Notice, #19 Exhibit 19 - Cloudflare Automatic Email Response, #20 Exhibit 20 - DMCA Takedown Notices, #21 Exhibit 21 - Cloudflare Automatic Email Responses)(McAteer, Sean)
June 2, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Jay M. Wolman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763967 ), #4 MOTION for Marc J. Randazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763968 ) referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 2, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Jay M. Wolman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763967 ), #4 MOTION for Marc J. Randazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1763968 ) referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. GoLocalProv, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Pierson
Represented By: Sean M. McAteer
Represented By: Jay Marshall Wolman
Represented By: Marc J. Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoLocalProv, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Hemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fenton Group, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Hemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloudflare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?