United States of America v. Hatch et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Richard H. Hatch, Jr., Kristin M. Hatch, Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Citizens Bank, N.A., State of Rhode Island, Department of Revenue, Division of Taxation, City of Newport Tax Collector, Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc. doing business as Lenders Network, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. doing business as Nominee for Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc. and Citizens Bank of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2022cv00332
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc. served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 19, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Kristin M. Hatch waiver sent on 9/21/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 19, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Richard H. Hatch, Jr waiver sent on 9/21/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 17, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc... (Shireman, Justin)
October 17, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Shireman on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Shireman, Justin)
October 17, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Shireman, Justin)
October 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Shireman on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Shireman, Justin)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 9/22/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 12, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Bank of America, N.A. waiver sent on 9/22/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 11, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Citizens Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 9/22/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. City of Newport Tax Collector waiver sent on 9/22/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Rhode Island, Department of Revenue, Division of Taxation waiver sent on 9/22/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Lieb, Samantha)
September 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Citizens Bank, N.A., City of Newport Tax Collector, Kristin M. Hatch, Richard H. Hatch, Jr, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc., State of Rhode Island, Department of Revenue, Division of Taxation. (Attachments: #1 Summons KMH, #2 Summons MLN USA, #3 MERS Summons, #4 BOA Summons, #5 CB Summons, #6 SORI Summons, #7 CONTC Summons)(DaCruz, Kayla)
September 12, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 12, 2022 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED Related Case Number 05cr09, 05cr98 based upon related cases previously assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Richard H. Hatch, Jr.), #3 Summons (Kristin M. Hatch), #4 Summons (Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc.), #5 Summons (Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.), #6 Summons (Bank of America, N.A.), #7 Summons (Citizens Bank, N.A.), #8 Summons (State of Rhode Island, Department of Revenue, Division of Taxation), #9 Summons (City of Newport Tax Collector))(Lieb, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hatch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samantha Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Hatch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin M. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Justin J. Shireman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island, Department of Revenue, Division of Taxation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newport Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc. doing business as Lenders Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. doing business as Nominee for Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc.
Represented By: Justin J. Shireman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?