Robinson et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert J. Robinson, Glenda Robinson, Gail Ullman, Augusto S. Vale, Elaine Durrell Frye, Diane M. Chirchirillo, Norma R. Smith, Michael A. Trusty, Elisabeth M. Trusty, Edward W. Tarty and Mary Louise Tarty
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Case Number: 1:2022cv00337
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The Plaintiffs filed Notices of Voluntary Dismissal on 10/18/2022 and 10/22/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/3/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Diane M. Chirchirillo, Elaine Durrell Frye, Glenda Robinson, Robert J. Robinson, Norma R. Smith, Gail Ullman, Augusto S. Vale Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice (Dion, Todd)
October 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice Supporting Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or, In the Alternative, to Compel Plaintiffs to Join Necessary Parties and to Strike Class Allegations re: #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, In the Alternative, to Compel Plaintiffs to Join Necessary Parties and to Strike Class Allegations filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Responses due by 11/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mortgage Executed by Robert L. and Glenda Robinson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Foreclosure Deed Under Power of Sale in Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 3 - June 30, 2016 Recorded Quitclaim Deed, #4 Exhibit 4- September 6, 2018 Recorded Quitclaim Deed, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mortgage Executed by Eric and Gail Ullman, #6 Exhibit 6 - Foreclosure Deed Under Power of Sale in Mortgage, #7 Exhibit 7 - May 2, 2016 Recorded Quitclaim Deed, #8 Exhibit 8 - September 29, 2016 Recorded Warranty Deed Executed by Focused Investments, LLC, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mortgage Executed by Augusto S. Vale, #10 Exhibit 10 - December 29, 2015 Foreclosure Deed, #11 Exhibit 11 - June 13, 2006 Recorded Quitclaim Deed, #12 Exhibit 12 - Mortgage Executed by Elaine and Jeffrey Durrell, #13 Exhibit 13 - January 12, 2016 Recorded Foreclosure Deed Under Power of Sale in Mortgage, #14 Exhibit 14 - March 11, 2016 Recorded Quitclaim Deed, #15 Exhibit 15 - July 22, 2016 Recorded Warranty Deed, #16 Exhibit 16 - November 18, 2019 Recorded Warranty Deed, #17 Exhibit 17 - Mortgage Executed by Diane M. and Dominic A. Chirchirillo, #18 Exhibit 18 - December 18, 2015 Recorded Foreclosure Deed, #19 Exhibit 19 - September 16, 2016 Recorded Quitclaim Deed, #20 Exhibit 20 - Mortgage Executed by Norma Smith, #21 Exhibit 21 - January 12, 2016 Recorded Foreclosure Deed Under Power of Sale in Mortgage, #22 Exhibit 22 - September 4, 2019 Recorded Special Warranty Deed, #23 Exhibit 23 - February 25, 202 Recorded Warranty Deed)(Haywood, Taylor)
October 21, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust in support of #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, In the Alternative, to Compel Plaintiffs to Join Necessary Parties and to Strike Class Allegations . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ullman Notice of Foreclosure Sale, #2 Exhibit 2 - Smith Notice of Foreclosure Sale, #3 Exhibit 3 - Durrell Frye Notice of Foreclosure Sale, #4 Exhibit 4 - Vale Notice of Foreclosure Sale, #5 Exhibit 5 - Chirchirillo Notice of Foreclosure Sale)(Haywood, Taylor)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, In the Alternative, to Compel Plaintiffs to Join Necessary Parties and to Strike Class Allegations filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Responses due by 11/4/2022. (Haywood, Taylor)
October 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Edward W. Tarty, Mary Louise Tarty, Elisabeth M. Trusty, Michael A. Trusty Voluntary Dismissal (Dion, Todd)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/11/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust answer due 10/21/2022; U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust answer due 10/21/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2022 Filing 9 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Responses due by 10/21/2022. (Carr, Peter)
September 16, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Taylor T. Haywood to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1795159 ) filed by All Defendants. (Carr, Peter)
September 16, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Marc J. Gottlieb to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number BRIDC-1795156 ) filed by All Defendants. (Carr, Peter)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc J. Gottlieb. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 9/16/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Taylor T. Haywood. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 9/16/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants Answer due by 10/7/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 9/14/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2022 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 13, 2022 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/27/2022. (Carr, Peter)
September 13, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp. for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.. (Carr, Peter)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NRZ Acquisition LLC, Corporate Parent Rithm Capital Corp., Corporate Parent New Residential Investment Corp. for Caliber Home Loans, Inc... (Carr, Peter)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2022-04729. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1793549, filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Property Cards, #3 Exhibit C - Summons to Caliber, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Peter)
September 13, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Robinson
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Robinson
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Ullman
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusto S. Vale
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Durrell Frye
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane M. Chirchirillo
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma R. Smith
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Trusty
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth M. Trusty
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward W. Tarty
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Louise Tarty
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Represented By: Taylor T. Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Represented By: Marc J. Gottlieb
Represented By: Taylor T. Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Represented By: Marc J. Gottlieb
Represented By: Taylor T. Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?