Metcalfe v. Hyundai Capital America et al
Plaintiff: Elsie Metcalfe
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America, Hyundai Lease Titling Trust and Grieco Hyundai LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00378
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE by Hyundai Capital America, Hyundai Lease Titling Trust (Lynch, William)
November 18, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Lutrario on behalf of Grieco Hyundai LLC (Lutrario, Ryan)
November 17, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent A. Indeglia on behalf of Grieco Hyundai LLC (Indeglia, Vincent)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #18 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Grieco Hyundai LLC answer due 12/23/2022; Hyundai Capital America answer due 12/23/2022; Hyundai Lease Titling Trust answer due 12/23/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/10/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 9, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by All Defendants. (Lynch, William)
November 9, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Lynch on behalf of All Defendants (Lynch, William)
November 4, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elsie Metcalfe. Grieco Hyundai LLC served on 11/2/2022, answer due 11/23/2022. (Edelman, Daniel)
October 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Ozello on behalf of Elsie Metcalfe (Ozello, Julia)
October 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Kolbus on behalf of Elsie Metcalfe (Kolbus, Heather)
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Elsie Metcalfe (Edelman, Daniel)
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Heather Kolbus to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1806803 ) filed by Elsie Metcalfe. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Julia Ozello to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1806801 ) filed by Elsie Metcalfe. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Daniel A. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1806799 ) filed by Elsie Metcalfe. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elsie Metcalfe. Hyundai Lease Titling Trust served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elsie Metcalfe. Hyundai Capital America served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Julia Ozello. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/24/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel A. Edelman. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/24/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Heather Kolbus. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/24/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Hyundai Capital America Summons, #2 Grieco Hyundai LLC Summons)(DaCruz, Kayla)
October 19, 2022 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
October 19, 2022 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Elsie Metcalfe. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint, Corrective Docket Entry, . (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 19, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Elsie Metcalfe. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Elsie Metcalfe. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Elsie Metcalfe. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1805350 ), filed by Elsie Metcalfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A-E))(Lefebvre, Christopher)
October 19, 2022 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY: This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found:Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (DaCruz, Kayla)
October 19, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metcalfe v. Hyundai Capital America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Metcalfe
Represented By: Christopher M. Lefebvre
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Heather Kolbus
Represented By: Julia Ozello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America
Represented By: William J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Lease Titling Trust
Represented By: William J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grieco Hyundai LLC
Represented By: Vincent A. Indeglia
Represented By: Ryan J. Lutrario
Represented By: William J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?