United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Local 5098
Plaintiff: United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Local 5098
Defendant: Rhode Island Hospital
Case Number: 1:2023cv00016
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 9 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #8 Response to Motion, Exhibit A and Exhibit B. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Callaci, Christopher)
March 7, 2023 Filing 8 First RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT RHODE ISLAND HOSPITAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 3/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law)(Callaci, Christopher)
February 21, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT RHODE ISLAND HOSPITAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Rhode Island Hospital. Responses due by 3/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Rizzotti, Anthony)
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory E. Henninger on behalf of Rhode Island Hospital (Henninger, Gregory)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Rizzotti on behalf of Rhode Island Hospital (Rizzotti, Anthony)
February 9, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Local 5098 (Callaci, Christopher)
January 13, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rhode Island Hospital. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 12, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1830486 ), filed by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Local 5098. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Callaci, Christopher)
January 12, 2023 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Local 5098
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Local 5098
Represented By: Christopher Callaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Hospital
Represented By: Anthony D. Rizzotti
Represented By: Gregory E. Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?