Teamsters Local 251 et al v. Williams
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 251, Secretary Treasurer Matthew Taibi and President Paul Santos
Defendant: Nick Williams
Case Number: 1:2023cv00124
Filed: March 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 7/17/2023; Factual Discovery to close by 11/17/2023; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/18/2023; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 1/17/2024; Expert Discovery to close by 2/19/2024; Motions due by 3/18/2024;. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/17/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
May 16, 2023 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, held on May 1, 2023, before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-752-7031. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 6/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2023. (Veitch, Denise) (Main Document 15 replaced on 5/18/2023) (McGuire, Vickie). (Main Document 15 replaced on 5/18/2023) (McGuire, Vickie). (Main Document 15 replaced on 5/18/2023) (McGuire, Vickie).
May 11, 2023 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #13 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. (Dias, Jennifer)
May 11, 2023 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5-1-2023 before Judge Mary S. McElroy. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Wiens, Elizabeth) (Main Document 13 replaced on 5/22/2023) (McGuire, Vickie).
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw. ECF #10 Motion to Adjudge in Contempt is withdraw. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/9/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
May 8, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE In Opposition to #10 MOTION to Adjudge in Contempt with supporting statement filed by Nick Williams. Replies due by 5/15/2023. (Goldberg, Lawrence)
May 5, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw #10 MOTION to Adjudge in Contempt with supporting statement filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/19/2023. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
May 4, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Adjudge in Contempt with supporting statement filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Wiens, Elizabeth)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for TRO. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/2/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
May 1, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2023 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: E. Weins and L. Goldberg in attendance. Arguments heard. For reasons stated on the record, the Court grants motion. Parties to submit Proposed Order (via email). Recess. (Court Reporter D. Veitch in Courtroom Remote Hearing at 10:00 am.) (Potter, Carrie)
April 28, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 5/5/2023. (Goldberg, Lawrence)
April 18, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support thereof : Motion Hearing reset for 5/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 999 9206, Passcode: 147349) (Potter, Carrie)
April 17, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing on #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support thereof : Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 999 9206, Passcode: 147349) (Potter, Carrie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Nick Williams.(Goldberg, Lawrence)
April 14, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance (Goldberg, Lawrence) Modified on 4/14/2023 to correct event type(Potter, Carrie).
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teamsters Local 251, Paul Santos, Matthew Taibi. All Defendants. (Gursky, Marc)
March 28, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nick Williams. (DaCruz, Kayla)
March 28, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
March 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1854803 ), filed by Teamsters Local 251, Paul Santos, Matthew Taibi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Gursky, Marc) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/28/2023) (DaCruz, Kayla).
March 28, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local 251 et al v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 251
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary Treasurer Matthew Taibi
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: President Paul Santos
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Williams
Represented By: Lawrence L. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?