American Commerce Insurance Company v. Chandley et al
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Company
Defendant: James Chandley, George L. Glover, III, Helen Belville, Rachel Weisman and C.M.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00174
Filed: May 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison M. Plunkett on behalf of Helen Belville, George L. Glover, III (Plunkett, Alison)
June 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan C. Hurley on behalf of Helen Belville, George L. Glover, III (Hurley, Ryan)
June 13, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Helen Belville, George L. Glover, III.(Hurley, Ryan)
May 26, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Commerce Insurance Company. James Chandley waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Robinson, Thomas)
May 26, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Commerce Insurance Company. Rachel Weisman waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Robinson, Thomas)
May 26, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Commerce Insurance Company. George L. Glover, III served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023. (Robinson, Thomas)
May 26, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Commerce Insurance Company. Helen Belville served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023. (Robinson, Thomas)
May 9, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Robinson, Thomas)
May 9, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Helen Belville, George L. Glover, III. (Kenny, Meghan)
May 9, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Robinson, Thomas)
May 9, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Robinson, Thomas)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 REDACTED version of COMPLAINT #1 Complaint for DJ by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Robinson, Thomas) Modified on 5/4/2023 to correct docket text. (Kenny, Meghan).
May 2, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
May 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1866705 ), filed by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Robinson, Thomas)
May 2, 2023 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Kenny, Meghan)
May 2, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Commerce Insurance Company v. Chandley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Chandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George L. Glover, III
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Represented By: Alison M. Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Belville
Represented By: Alison M. Plunkett
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Weisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?