Tassone v. Salisbury et al
Plaintiff: Gary Tassone
Defendant: Wayne Salisbury, Nancy Routolo Hull, Dorathy Kruck, Frank Pezza and Richard Hahn
Case Number: 1:2023cv00217
Filed: May 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE: The Court has granted IFP status and ordered the complaint to be served. Pursuant to the Agreement on Service between the U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island and the Rhode Island Attorney General, this Notice constitutes service as directed by the Court. Within 30 days, the RI Attorney General shall file a Notice of Acceptance of Service or a Notice of Declination of Service or both if necessary on behalf of the defendant(s) named in the complaint. # Please click here to access the Acceptance of Service form or # Please click here to access the Declination of Service form .Notice of Acceptance or Declination of Service due by 8/16/2023. (Kenny, Meghan)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Based on the Court's review of the Motion and Plaintiff's Inmate Account Statement, the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff paid the filing fee in full prior to requesting permission to proceed IFP, thereby fulfilling his requirement under the Prison Litigation Reform Act of 1995 ("the Act"), adopted April 26, 1996, and codified at 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The U.S. Marshal for this District shall serve Defendants forthwith with a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Memorandum and Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/17/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel (ECF No. 2) is DENIED without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/17/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (ECF No. 3) be DENIED. #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gary Tassone. Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/17/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 12, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order referred for determination to Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
July 6, 2023 Filing 11 DUPLICATE Copy of Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis received by Clerks Office. (Kenny, Meghan)
July 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gary Tassone. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kenny, Meghan)
July 6, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Assign. Based on the docket, Defendants in this case have not yet been served, and, relevant to Plaintiff's Motion, an application for Clerks Entry of Default does not require a hearing. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/28/2023. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
June 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Assign re: #8 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Gary Tassone. Responses due by 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ, #2 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
June 21, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Gary Tassone as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
June 21, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 FP SUMMONS, #2 RH SUMMONS, #3 DK SUMMONS, #4 NR SUMMONS)(DaCruz, Kayla)
June 16, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from Gary Tassone. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DaCruz, Kayla)
June 16, 2023 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #6 Letter. Clerk's Office mailed copy of docket sheet. (DaCruz, Kayla)
May 26, 2023 Filing 5 Letter from Gary Tassone. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DaCruz, Kayla)
May 26, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 100000230. (DaCruz, Kayla)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $402.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 6/14/2023. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/24/2023. (DaCruz, Kayla)
May 24, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gary Tassone. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
May 24, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Gary Tassone. Responses due by 6/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
May 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Gary Tassone. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 NHR Summons, #8 DK Summons, #9 RH Summons, #10 FP Summons, #11 WS Summons, #12 Complaint Cover Sheet, #13 Cover Letter (1), #14 Cover Letter (2), #15 Envelope (1), #16 Envelope (2))(DaCruz, Kayla)
May 24, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tassone v. Salisbury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Tassone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Routolo Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorathy Kruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Pezza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?