Michael M. v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Michael A McKiernan
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2023cv00320
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Consenting to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Almond. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/25/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 21, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Pere on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Pere, Luis)
September 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 10/5/2023. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 10/5/2023. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 21, 2023 Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 9/22/2023. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER terminating #7 Motion for Order to Show Cause. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/21/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Michael A McKiernan. Responses due by 10/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER terminating #5 Motion for Order to Show Cause. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/18/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - The Order to Show Cause was not issued regarding the delay in filing a civil cover sheet. The outstanding issue is laid out clearly in the Court's August 8, 2023 Text Order regarding the need for further information in support of Plaintiff's pending request for IFP/indigent status. The Clerk is directed to resend such Text Order to counsel, and counsel shall promptly respond as directed in the Text Order or the case will be dismissed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/18/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Michael A McKiernan. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, . (McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
September 15, 2023 Filing 5 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Michael A McKiernan. Responses due by 9/29/2023. (McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by September 22, 2023 as to why this case should not be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with the Court's August 8, 2023 Text Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/12/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 31, 2023 New Case Filing Fee Paid $ 402.00, Receipt Number ARIDC-1906093 re #1 Complaint filed by Michael A McKiernan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
August 8, 2023 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Michael A McKiernan. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
August 8, 2023 Filing 3 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael A McKiernan. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER DENIED. First, Plaintiff's application is incomplete as he failed to answer question 2(b) as required and he appears to somewhat understate his monthly expenses in response to question 7 by not including items such as food, clothing, gas, electricity, etc. Second, and more importantly, Plaintiff reports a significant cash or account balance on hand which prevents him from meeting his burden of showing that he qualifies for IFP/indigent status because he is financially unable to pay the applicable civil case filing fee. He offers no explanation or extenuating circumstances that might explain how someone with access to that sum of money cannot afford to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff is directed to pay the applicable civil case filing fee in the amount of $402.00 by September 1, 2023. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case for lack of prosecution #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/8/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER DENIED without prejudice to refiling with a Financial Affidavit #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/7/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael A McKiernan. (McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Michael A McKiernan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Errata summons, #3 Errata summons, #4 Errata summons)(McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
August 4, 2023 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
August 4, 2023 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY: his case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not Signed. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael M. v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A McKiernan
Represented By: Kelly M. McKenna-Cournoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Luis A. Pere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?