Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island v. New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199, SEIU
Plaintiff: Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island
Defendant: New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199, SEIU
Case Number: 1:2023cv00404
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:23-cv-00466. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) through PACER.gov
September 28, 2023 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ferguson, L.)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: The Motion of Defendant to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (ECF No. #26 ) is hereby GRANTED for the reasons set forth in the attached document. The Clerk shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 09/20/2023. (Vascotto, J.)
July 31, 2023 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support re #26 First MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU. (Gursky, Marc)
July 24, 2023 Filing 36 OBJECTION re #26 First MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rosemary Healey)(McCormack, Michael)
July 14, 2023 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU.(Creane, Kevin)
July 13, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #26 First MOTION to Transfer to Another District. Responses due by 7/24/2023. (Ferguson, L.)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion with Consent for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer (ECF No. #33 ) is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff shall file its response on or before July 24, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 07/13/2023. (Frazier, T.)
July 7, 2023 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 First MOTION to Transfer to Another District until 07/24/2023 by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (McCormack, Michael)
July 7, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc B Gursky on behalf of New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU (Gursky, Marc)
July 7, 2023 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marc Gursky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7376564) by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU. (Gursky, Marc)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report (ECF No. #27 ) is hereby GRANTED. The parties shall file their Rule 26(f) Report on or before 14 days after a ruling is issued on the defendant's motion to transfer (ECF No. #26 ). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 07/06/2023. (Frazier, T.)
June 30, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy K. Baldwin on behalf of Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island (Baldwin, Timothy)
June 30, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Whelan on behalf of Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island (Whelan, Joseph)
June 30, 2023 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Rule 26(f) Report by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (McCormack, Michael)
June 19, 2023 Filing 26 First MOTION to Transfer to Another District by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Affidavit of Heather Kelley)(Passero, Michael)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Motion for Attorney Marc Gursky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #17 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/14/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 06/15/2023 (Frazier, T.). Modified on 6/15/2023 to edit text (Ferguson, L.).
June 15, 2023 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph D. Whelan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7376802) by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (McCormack, Michael)
June 15, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Timothy K. Baldwin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7376814) by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (McCormack, Michael)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Attorney Timothy K. Baldwin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/13/2023. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2023. (Mendez, D)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Attorney Joseph D. Whelan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/13/2023. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2023. (Mendez, D)
June 9, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Timothy K. Baldwin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7376814) by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Timothy K. Baldwin)(McCormack, Michael)
June 9, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph D. Whelan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7376802) by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Joseph D. Whelan)(McCormack, Michael)
June 9, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marc Gursky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7376564) Signed By Marc Gursky filed by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU. (Passero, Michael)
June 9, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marc Gursky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7376564) by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU. (Passero, Michael)
June 7, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Allen Creane, I on behalf of New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU Amended (Previously filed Docket #10) (Creane, Kevin)
May 31, 2023 Answer deadline updated for New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU to 7/18/2023. (Ferguson, L.)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The defendant's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #12 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. See ECF No. 14 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 05/31/2023. (Frazier, T.)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The defendant's Amended Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendant shall file its response on or before July 18, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 05/31/2023. (Frazier, T.)
May 30, 2023 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2023Amended Respond to Complaint #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2023 Respond to Complaint by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU. (Passero, Michael)
May 24, 2023 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2023 Respond to Complaint by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU. (Passero, Michael)
May 10, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU waiver sent on 4/18/2023, answer due 6/17/2023 filed by New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU. (Passero, Michael)
May 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Passero on behalf of New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU Kevin Creane (Passero, Michael)
May 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Passero on behalf of New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU (Passero, Michael)
April 14, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199 SEIU* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney * Michael T. McCormack* *O'Sullivan McCormack Jensen & Bliss PC* *180 Glastonbury Boulevard Suite 210* *Glastonbury, CT 06033*. (Mendez, D)
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, filed by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 14, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island identifying Corporate Parent Care New England Health System for Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (McCormack, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/13/2023.(Mendez, D)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/13/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2023. Discovery due by 10/13/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/13/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/13/23.(Hushin, Z.)
April 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199, SEIU ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7310616.), filed by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCormack, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
April 13, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199, SEIU. (McCormack, Michael)
April 13, 2023 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island v. New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199, SEIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Represented By: Matthew Hayes Parker
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Health Care Employees Union, District 1199, SEIU
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Represented By: Michael E. Passero
Represented By: Kevin Allen Creane, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?