Benson v. Jo-Ann V Fisheries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Benson
Defendant: Jo-Ann V Fisheries, LLC, f/v JO-ANN V (Official # 1038917), its engines, fishing gear, fishing permits, bunkers and appurtenances, etc., in rem and f/v JO-ANN V (Official # 1038917)
Case Number: 1:2023cv00441
Filed: October 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2024; Factual Discovery to close by 5/15/2024; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/17/2024; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/15/2024; Expert Discovery to close by 8/15/2024; Motions due by 9/16/2024;. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/15/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jo-Ann V Fisheries, LLC. (McSweeney, Francis)
November 14, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Jo-Ann V Fisheries, LLC, f/v JO-ANN V (Official # 1038917).(McSweeney, Francis)
November 14, 2023 Filing 7 First MOTION for Francis McSweeney to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1931039 ) filed by All Defendants. (Mason, Fred)
November 14, 2023 Filing 6 First MOTION for Joseph A. Regan Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1931027 ) filed by All Defendants. (Mason, Fred)
November 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred L. Mason, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Mason, Fred)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Francis G. McSweeney. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/14/2023. (Hill, Cherelle)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph A. Regan. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/14/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Benson. Jo-Ann V Fisheries, LLC served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Fulweiler, John)
October 26, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jo-Ann V Fisheries, LLC. (Hill, Cherelle)
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
October 26, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)
October 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by David Benson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 (Proposed) Summons)(Fulweiler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Jo-Ann V Fisheries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Benson
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo-Ann V Fisheries, LLC
Represented By: Francis G. McSweeney
Represented By: Fred L. Mason, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph A. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/v JO-ANN V (Official # 1038917), its engines, fishing gear, fishing permits, bunkers and appurtenances, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/v JO-ANN V (Official # 1038917)
Represented By: Francis G. McSweeney
Represented By: Fred L. Mason, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph A. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?