Jones v. RI State Police et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Jones
Defendant: RI State Police and Hopkinton Police
Case Number: 1:2023cv00446
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hopkinton Police. Responses due by 12/26/2023. (Sypole, Stephen)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Sypole on behalf of Hopkinton Police (Sypole, Stephen)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by RI State Police in support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (Baittinger, Chelsea)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RI State Police. Responses due by 12/26/2023. (Baittinger, Chelsea)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Baittinger on behalf of RI State Police (Baittinger, Chelsea)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Jones. Hopkinton Police served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023; RI State Police served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Hill, Cherelle)
November 14, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hopkinton Police, RI State Police. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hill, Cherelle)
November 14, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Matthew Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hill, Cherelle)
November 14, 2023 DOCKET NOTE: Complaint, Summons and USM-285 Forms forwarded to the Marshalls for Service. (Hill, Cherelle) Modified on 11/14/2023 to correct docket text. (Hill, Cherelle).
November 2, 2023 Filing 4 Letter sent to Matthew Jones requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie)
November 2, 2023 DOCKET NOTE: Blank summons forms and USM-285 forms mailed to plaintiff on 11/2/2023 (Potter, Carrie)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is hereby ordered to serve the plaintiffs summons and complaint on the defendants. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/2/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
October 27, 2023 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Matthew Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Matthew Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
October 27, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. RI State Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RI State Police
Represented By: Chelsea Baittinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkinton Police
Represented By: Stephen J. Sypole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?