Elizabeth V. v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Valetta
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Martin O'Malley
Interested Party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2023cv00459
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER:The Plaintiff shall have up to and including 2/5/2024 to file a Motion to Modify, Reverse, or Remand the Decision of the Commissioner. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/4/2024. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development, #7 Medical Records 1, #8 Medical Records 2, #9 Medical Records 3, #10 Medical Records 4)(Pere, Luis)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d), Martin O'Malley has been substituted for Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi as the defendant in this action. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 01/04/2024. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/4/2024. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Pere on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Pere, Luis)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED. # Personal Identifier Statement due 11/8/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
November 7, 2023 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 11/21/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/7/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elizabeth A Valetta. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Elizabeth A Valetta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
November 6, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizabeth V. v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Valetta
Represented By: Kelly M. McKenna-Cournoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Luis A. Pere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Luis A. Pere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?