RIFT-AFT Local 6516 v. Brown University
Plaintiff: Graduate Labor Org RIFT-AFT Local 6516
Defendant: Brown University
Case Number: 1:2023cv00461
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Graduate Labor Org RIFT-AFT Local 6516. Replies due by 1/5/2024. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Set/reset deadlines: #5 Motion to Dismiss - Responses due by 1/2/2024. Replies due by 1/12/2024.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/15/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Graduate Labor Org RIFT-AFT Local 6516. Responses due by 12/26/2023. (Gursky, Marc)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/4/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Alison Roberge on behalf of Brown University (Roberge, Jessica)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brown University. Responses due by 12/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Whelan, Joseph)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 PETITION to Enforce Arbitration Award ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1928898 ) filed by Brown University. Responses due by 12/12/2023. (Whelan, Joseph)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brown University. (Hill, Cherelle)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce Arbitration Award ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1928898 ), filed by Graduate Labor Org RIFT-AFT Local 6516. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitrator Award, #2 Exhibit Arbitrator Supplemental Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Summons)(Gursky, Marc)
November 7, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIFT-AFT Local 6516 v. Brown University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graduate Labor Org RIFT-AFT Local 6516
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: Jessica Alison Sclafani
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?