CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries v. The United States
Plaintiff: CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries
Defendant: The United States
Case Number: 1:2023cv00492
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The United States answer due 3/25/2024. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/3/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Motion) filed by The United States. Responses due by 1/5/2024. (Weaver, James)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries The United States served on 12/1/2023, answer due 1/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Corrente, Robert)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Corrente, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Caroline C. Setliffe to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1938326 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Corrente, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Sarah E. Paul to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1938321 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Corrente, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Dwight Norris Mersereau to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1938315 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Corrente, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for S. Starling Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1938305 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Corrente, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for David J. Fischer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1938302 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Corrente, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Carina C. Federico to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1938295 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Corrente, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for David B. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1938284 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Corrente, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dwight N. Mersereau. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of S. Starling Marshall. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Caroline C. Setliffe. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Paul. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carina C. Federico. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Fischer. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: As requested in #4 Letter, CVS Health Corp is authorized to exceed LR Gen 204(c) and file seven Motions for Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David B. Blair. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2023. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Robert Corrente regarding pro hac vice attorney admissions (Potter, Carrie)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The United States. (Hill, Cherelle)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1934364 ), filed by CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Corrente, Robert)
November 21, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries v. The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Health Corporation and Subsidiaries
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Carina C. Federico
Represented By: Caroline C. Setliffe
Represented By: David B. Blair
Represented By: David J. Fischer
Represented By: Dwight Norris Mersereau
Represented By: Sarah E. Paul
Represented By: S. Starling Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Represented By: James Edward Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?