JENKINS v. UNITED STATES et al
Plaintiff: Gary V. Jenkins
Defendant: United States of America, International Association of Fire Fighters, State of Rhode Island, East Providence Firefighters, Malcolm Moore, MATHEW T. OLIVERIO and Joseph F. Penza
Case Number: 1:2023cv00512
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 DOCKET NOTE: Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff at corrected address. (Potter, Carrie)
December 20, 2023 Filing 26 Mail Returned: Docket Sheet mailed to Gary V. Jenkins returned as undeliverable. (Hill, Cherelle) To modified text 2/1/2024 (Hill, Cherelle).
December 8, 2023 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-03757. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) through PACER.gov
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Rhode Island pursuant to #10 Order, Sent to Court via extraction. (zjm)
November 22, 2023 Filing 23 MANDATE of USCA as to #13 APPEAL FROM TRANSFER ORDER - Notice of Appeal ; USCA Case Number 23-5018. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order 7/11/2023)(znmw)
March 6, 2023 Filing 22 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #13 APPEAL FROM TRANSFER ORDER - Notice of Appeal, #20 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, #21 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ;USCA Case Number 23-5018. (zjm)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 16, 2023. (lcckk1)
February 14, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by GARY V. JENKINS. (zjm)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER of USCA as to #13 APPEAL FROM TRANSFER ORDER - Notice of Appeal ; USCA Case Number 23-5018. (Attachment: #1 IFP)(zjm)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On January 23, 2023, the Court granted Plaintiff leave to file four additional motions, notwithstanding the Court's #10 Order dismissing this case in part and transferring the remainder to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island. On January 20, 2023, Plaintiff filed his #13 Notice of Appeal of that Order.In his #15 Motion "Objection to ORDER," Plaintiff presents "[l]egal questions" evidently related to the merits of his claims against the parties now transferred to the District of Rhode Island. To the extent he requests reconsideration of the Court's #10 Order, that request is DENIED because he offers absolutely no reason for the Court to reconsider the #10 Order. Plaintiff also appends to this Motion a one-page document where he states "[v]enue is proper in the R.I. Supreme Court." Above that statement, it appears he had written "Rhode Island Supreme Court has original jurisdiction over this action," then crossed out "Rhode Island Supreme Court" to replace it with "USDC District of Columbia."In his #16 Motion "Continuance," it appears Plaintiff seeks a continuance of a court date. Because there is no pending deadline or court date beyond transfer (which he has appealed, notwithstanding that a transfer order is not a final, appealable order), this Motion is DENIED AS MOOT.In his #17 Motion "Proof of Entry," Plaintiff appears to ask the Court to order the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia to enter an appearance in this case. Because the Court lacks that authority and, in any event, this case is now closed, this Motion is DENIED.Finally, in his #18 Motion "Rule 19 Joinder of United States Attorney General," Plaintiff evidently seeks to add the Attorney General of the United States Merrick Garland as an indispensable party. For the same reasons stated in the Court's #11 Memorandum Opinion, and in the absence of any legal argument whatsoever, this Motion is also DENIED.Having resolved all pending motions, the Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this minute order to the pro se Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 26, 2023. (lcckk1)
January 25, 2023 USCA Case Number 23-5018 for #13 APPEAL FROM TRANSFER ORDER - Notice of Appeal. (zjm)
January 23, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Rule 19 Joinder of United States Attorney General by GARY V. JENKINS. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/23/2023. (zjm) Modified on 2/14/2023 (zljn).
January 23, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Proof of Entry by GARY V. JENKINS. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/23/2023. (zjm) Modified on 2/14/2023 (zljn).
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue by GARY V. JENKINS. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/23/2023. (zjm) Modified on 2/14/2023 (zljn).
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Objection to Order re #10 Order, by GARY V. JENKINS. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/23/2023. (zjm) Modified on 1/25/2023 to correct docket text (zjm). Modified on 2/14/2023 (zljn).
January 23, 2023 Filing 14 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis has been decided re #13 APPEAL FROM TRANSFER ORDER - Notice of Appeal. (zjm)
January 23, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 1/29/2023. (dot)
January 20, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Appeal of Transfer Order filed by GARY V. JENKINS forwarded to USCA. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zjm)
January 19, 2023 Filing 12 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Rhode Island pursuant to #10 Order, Sent to Court via extraction. (zjm) Modified on 1/23/2023 due to premature transfer (zjm).
January 19, 2023 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Receipt on 01/19/2023 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:23-cv-00031 sent by District of Rhode Island. (zjm) Modified on 1/23/2023 due to premature transfer (zjm).
January 9, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 1/19/2023. (dot)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #10 Order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail copies of this memorandum opinion and accompanying #10 Order to the pro se Plaintiff at their address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 9, 2023. (lcckk1)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing in part #1 Complaint and transferring remainder of matter to District of Rhode Island. After transfer, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 9, 2023. (lcckk1)
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 Case directly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly as related. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
December 30, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Issue Subpoena by GARY V. JENKINS. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Subpoenas)(zed)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Complaint, by GARY V. JENKINS. (Attachment: #1 Summons)(zed)
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Complaint, by GARY V. JENKINS. (Attachment: #1 Summons)(zed)
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by GARY V. JENKINS (zed)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GARY V. JENKINS. Case related to Case No. 22-3660. (zed)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FIRE FIGHTERS served on 12/22/2022, answer due 1/12/2023 (zed)
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons (6) Issued as to EAST PROVIDENCE FIREFIGHTERS, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FIRE FIGHTERS, MALCOLM MOORE, MATHEW T. OLIVERIO, JOSEPH F. PENZA, RHODE ISLAND STATE. (zed)
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EAST PROVIDENCE FIREFIGHTERS, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FIRE FIGHTERS, MALCOLM MOORE, MATHEW T. OLIVERIO, JOSEPH F. PENZA, RHODE ISLAND STATE, UNITED STATES ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 203659) filed by GARY V. JENKINS. (Attachment: #1 Addendum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINS v. UNITED STATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary V. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Fire Fighters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Providence Firefighters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATHEW T. OLIVERIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F. Penza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?