U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee of Igloo Series V Trust v. Paliotta et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee of Igloo Series V Trust
Defendant: Bruno Paliotta, Giuseppe B. Paliotta, John J Paliotta, Department of Treasury-Internal Revenue Service and State of Rhode Island Division of Taxation
Case Number: 1:2023cv00532
Filed: December 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Vacate #1 Complaint, #8 Clerk's Entry of Default and to Extend Time to Answer to February 15, 2024 Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Bruno Paliotta, Giuseppe B. Paliotta, John J Paliotta. Responses due by 2/16/2024. (Ennis, John)
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Ennis on behalf of Bruno Paliotta, Giuseppe B. Paliotta, John J Paliotta (Ennis, John)
January 26, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Department of Treasury-Internal Revenue Service, Bruno Paliotta, Giuseppe B. Paliotta, John J Paliotta (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
January 26, 2024 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee of Igloo Series V Trust as to Department of Treasury-Internal Revenue Service, Bruno Paliotta, Giuseppe B. Paliotta, John J Paliotta. (Shaw, David)
January 23, 2024 Filing 6 RI Division of Taxation ANSWER to Complaint by State of Rhode Island Division of Taxation.(Beretta, John)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee of Igloo Series V Trust Department of Treasury-Internal Revenue Service served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. (Shaw, David)
January 16, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee of Igloo Series V Trust Bruno Paliotta served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024; Giuseppe B. Paliotta served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024; John J Paliotta served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024; State of Rhode Island Division of Taxation served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. (Shaw, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Department of Treasury-Internal Revenue Service, Bruno Paliotta, Giuseppe B. Paliotta, John J Paliotta, State of Rhode Island Division of Taxation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hill, Cherelle)
December 15, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
December 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-1942733 ), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee of Igloo Series V Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons Request, #3 Exhibit Summons Request, #4 Exhibit Summons Request, #5 Exhibit Summons Request, #6 Exhibit Summons Request)(Shaw, David)
December 15, 2023 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee of Igloo Series V Trust v. Paliotta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee of Igloo Series V Trust
Represented By: David Arnold Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruno Paliotta
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giuseppe B. Paliotta
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J Paliotta
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury-Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island Division of Taxation
Represented By: John A. Beretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?