Laurence, Jr. v. Nerohna et al
Plaintiff: Norman Laurence, Jr.
Defendant: Peter F Nerohna, Wayne T. Salisbury Jr., Rachel C. Bray, Alfred Zannini, Kimberly Kane, RN David Piccirillo, RN Dacia Montenegro, John Santagata, Warden Corry and Kimberly Kane, MD
Case Number: 1:2024cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Raimondi on behalf of Rachel C. Bray, Kimberly Kane, MD, Dacia Montenegro, Peter F Nerohna, David Piccirillo, Wayne T. Salisbury Jr., John Santagata, Warden Corry, Alfred Zannini (Raimondi, Lisa)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter from Norman Laurence, Jr. re: Payment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Hill, Cherelle)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order PLRA Filing fee: $ 25.00. Received - receipt number 100001125 Total Amount Paid to date: $25.00. (Hill, Cherelle) Modified text on 2/28/2024 (Hill, Cherelle).
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Acceptance of Service filed by Kimberly Kane, MD, Wayne T. Salisbury Jr., David Piccirillo, John Santagata, Dacia Montenegro, Rachel C. Bray, Peter F Nerohna, Warden Corry, Alfred Zannini. Kimberly Kane, MD served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; Wayne T. Salisbury Jr. served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; David Piccirillo served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; John Santagata served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; Dacia Montenegro served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; Rachel C. Bray served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; Peter F Nerohna served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; Warden Corry served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; Alfred Zannini served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024. (Raimondi, Lisa)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #12 MOTION to Appoint Expert referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #10 MOTION for Service; denying without prejudice #11 Motion to Compel: Plaintiff's Motion for Service #10 is denied as moot. The Court is obtaining service through the agreement with the state. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #11 is denied without prejudice; the Defendants have not yet been served and the Plaintiff has not yet served the Defendants with a Request for Production of the documents, which is required before a motion in court can be filed. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/12/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from Norman Laurence, Jr. regarding Exhibit A & B. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Hill, Cherelle)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #15 Letter information sent on 02/01/2024. (Hill, Cherelle)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff is directed to refrain from filing any further motions, pleadings, filings, or notices until the Defendants have filed a response to the Complaint. This order does not apply to pleadings related to the filing of a notice of appeal or in the case of an emergency. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/1/2024. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Clerks office is directed to return all documents received on 01/31/2023 and 02/01/2024.So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/1/2024. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order DOCKET NOTE: The Clerks office sent Mr. Laurence an updated corrected docket sheet showing his Exhibits A and B which were filed on the record upon receipt by the Court. Regarding: #3 Exhibits in Support. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Norman Laurence, Jr. in support of #13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #12 MOTION to Appoint Expert. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope) CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office 1/30/2024 as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2024: #3 Exhibit 2, #4 2nd Letter to Clerk, #6 Envelope 2) (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana).
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Norman Laurence, Jr.. Responses due by 2/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope)(Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Expert filed by Norman Laurence, Jr.. Responses due by 2/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope)(Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Norman Laurence, Jr.. Responses due by 2/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted 1/30/2024 by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2024: #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 2nd Letter to Clerk) (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana).
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Service filed by Norman Laurence, Jr.. Responses due by 2/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 2nd Letter to Clerk, #4 Envelope)(Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2024: #5 Exhibit) (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana).
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order DOCKET NOTE: As requested by Plaintiff in [12-2] Letter to Clerk, Clerk's Office mailed back a copy of the public docket sheet. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from Norman Laurence, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Hill, Cherelle)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE: The Court has granted IFP status and ordered the complaint to be served. Pursuant to the Agreement on Service between the U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island and the Rhode Island Attorney General, this Notice constitutes service as directed by the Court. Within 30 days, the RI Attorney General shall file a Notice of Acceptance of Service or a Notice of Declination of Service or both if necessary on behalf of the defendant(s) named in the complaint. # Please click here to access the Acceptance of Service form or # Please click here to access the Declination of Service form .Notice of Acceptance or Declination of Service due by 2/26/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: The Court has reviewed Mr. Laurence's Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and finds that at this stage the Complaint does not appear to be frivolous, and it states a claim upon which relief can be granted sufficient to have the Complaint served on the Defendants. Furthermore, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 . Plaintiff is still required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), Mr. Laurence must pay $25.00 as the first part of the filing fee. The Court directs the ACI to send to the Court each month 20% of the previous month's balance in Mr. Laurence's account every time that amount exceeds $10.00 until he has paid the entire filing fee of $350.00. Mr. Laurence shall make his first payment of $25 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The United States Marshals Service is hereby ordered to serve the plaintiffs summons and complaint on the defendants. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/24/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Norman Laurence, Jr. (Attachments: #1 IFP letter, #2 Envelope)(Hill, Cherelle)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter from Norman Laurence, Jr. re: TEXT ORDER dated 1/8/2024. Clerk's Office mailed back a copy of the public docket sheet and Notifications for #3 and #4 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF #1 COMPLAINT, filed by Norman Laurence, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Sullivan, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Envelope) (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. This entry has been modified to edit the docket text Modified on 2/1/2024 (Kenny, Meghan).
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXHIBIT A AND EXHIBIT B in support of #1 Complaint, filed by Norman Laurence, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope)(Hill, Cherelle) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).< This entry was updated to correct the docket text (Kenny, Meghan).
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Mr. Laurence is ordered file a copy of his inmate account within 30 days before the Court can rule on his motion to proceed without the payment of costs. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/8/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Norman Laurence, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Norman Laurence, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Envelope) (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurence, Jr. v. Nerohna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Laurence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter F Nerohna
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne T. Salisbury Jr.
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel C. Bray
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Zannini
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN David Piccirillo
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Dacia Montenegro
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Santagata
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Corry
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Kane, MD
Represented By: Lisa Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?