Keller, IV v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: George Keller, IV
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and John Doe Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv00154
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company answer due 7/1/2024; John Doe Corporation answer due 7/1/2024; PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 7/1/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/24/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
May 22, 2024 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 6/5/2024. (Goldberg, Jessica)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/1/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
May 1, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answers due by 5/24/2024 (Potter, Carrie)
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 5/8/2024. (Goldberg, Jessica)
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Kenny, Meghan)
April 18, 2024 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY.. (Goldberg, Jessica)
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PHH Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation.. (Goldberg, Jessica)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2024-01668. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ARIDC-1985737, filed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldberg, Jessica)
April 18, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller, IV v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Keller, IV
Represented By: Patrick F. Dowling, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Jessica Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Jessica Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?