Crow et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Michael Clark, Kevin Felker, Martha Krietemeyer, Benjamin Wilmore, Dante Grey, Dawn Purkey, Daniel Wallace, Margo Rhine, Erica Neal, Thomas Mathews, Maren Comfort, Alexis Esselman, Tina Farrell, Latischa Harris, Kristin Florez, Thomas (I) Mathews, Dana (I) Phillips, David Harris, Gwendolyn Whitfield, Michael Jones, Dana Phillips, Marva Monteith, Thomas Grabe, Patricia Moyers, Carla Guelker, Lisa (I) P. Benjamin, Mateo Robinson, Marne Kosobucki, Robbin Vinyard, Isabelle Justice, Mary Morris, Melissa Salser, Dennis Crow, Justine Hanneman, Derek Phillips, Lorraine Balck, David Maslowski, Robert Rhine, Robbie Wooden, Shanna Vallejos, Lawrence Walker, Kimberly (I) Chappell, Bradley Buono, Yolanda Wilson, Pete Martinez, Christopher Wheeler, Christine Bertrand, Jason Farrell, Denise Williams, Skyy Farrell, Lilton Monteith, Mark Robinson, Cameron Martinez, Dawn Maslowski, John Higgins, Leo Spagnolini, Lisa P. Benjamin, Max Schwyter, Tina Quintal, Arnette Booth, Alyssa Martinez, Michelle Matheny, Linda Crow, Thomas Burton, Michelle Boyd, Marie Engleman, Patricia Frank, Kathy Coleman, Jill Schwyter, Terry Sunderlin, John Vigil, Natasha Steinberg, Linnita Williams, Lieutenant Alfred Grant, Alicia Ornelas, Larry Davidson, Jeff Frank, Christine Felker, Shelly-Ann Higgins, Rebecca Sunderlin, Robert Roberson, Roy Whitfield, Tina (I) Farrell, Thomas Powers, John Moore, Ava Higgins, Karen Brant, Kathleen Burton, Melanie Stanton, Deborah Phillips, Maren (I) Comfort, Lynn (I) Martinez, Shawn Roberson, Angilo Vera, Jasmine Kizer, Jose Santiago, ., Michael Matli, Christopher Marinez, Angel Wilmore, Maria Zakrzewski, Deborah Kloberdanz, Martha Scroggs, Kimberly Chappell, Cheyenne Farrell, Monika Malmquist, Jeanne Basinger, Randall Keiley, Kimberly Eckoldt, Daniel Malmquist, Virginia Medina, Jonathan Cannon, Sharon Ostertag, Timothy Williams, Robert Pena, Jeffery Comfort, Norma Hilde, Fabian Mendoza, Daniel Kloberdanz, Melva Tillar, Michelle Powers, Mark Holtorf, Efrain Vera-Soto, Marne (I) Kosobucki, Ute Quintal, Michael McBee, Athel Bluebird, Clifford Knudson, Jack Cummings, Marion Garner, Lynn Martinez, Lyndel Felker, Tina Mathews, Thomas Hochberg, Kenneth Benjamin, Jr., Marie Clark, Glenna Moore, Michelle (I) Powers, Angel (I) Wilmore, Amy Clark, Travis Jacobs-Hoffman, Frances Gortmaker, Daniel Florez, Michelle Brink, Catherine Zaborski, William Wooden, Jerry Gortmaker, Timothy Clubb, Shirley Crow, Ivan Engleman, Kevin Daniels, Sr., Larry Price, Ralph Scroggs and Kerri Cannon
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. and UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03403
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 29 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01196, Crow et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03403-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01196. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01196 RBJ, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Karen Brant, Michelle Brink, Bradley Buono, Kathleen Burton, Thomas Burton, Jonathan Cannon, Kerri Cannon, Kimberly Chappell, Kimberly (I) Chappell, Amy Clark, Marie Clark, Michael Clark, Timothy Clubb, Kathy Coleman, Jeffery Comfort, Maren Comfort, Maren (I) Comfort, Dennis Crow, Linda Crow, Shirley Crow, Jack Cummings, Kevin Daniels, Sr, Larry Davidson, Kimberly Eckoldt, Ivan Engleman, Marie Engleman, Alexis Esselman, Cheyenne Farrell, Jason Farrell, Skyy Farrell, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Christine Felker, Kevin Felker, Lyndel Felker, Daniel Florez, Kristin Florez, Jeff Frank, Patricia Frank, Marion Garner, Frances Gortmaker, Jerry Gortmaker, Thomas Grabe, Alfred Grant, Dante Grey, Carla Guelker, Justine Hanneman, David Harris, Latischa Harris, Ava Higgins, John Higgins, Shelly-Ann Higgins, Norma Hilde, Thomas Hochberg, Mark Holtorf, Travis Jacobs-Hoffman, Michael Jones, Isabelle Justice, Randall Keiley, Jasmine Kizer, Daniel Kloberdanz, Deborah Kloberdanz, Clifford Knudson, Marne Kosobucki, Marne (I) Kosobucki, Martha Krietemeyer, Daniel Malmquist, Monika Malmquist, Christopher Marinez, Alyssa Martinez, Cameron Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Lynn (I) Martinez, Pete Martinez, David Maslowski, Lorraine Balck, Jeanne Basinger, Kenneth Benjamin, Jr, Lisa P. Benjamin, Lisa (I) P. Benjamin, Christine Bertrand, Athel Bluebird, Arnette Booth, Michelle Boyd, Dawn Maslowski, Michelle Matheny, Thomas Mathews, Tina Mathews, Thomas (I) Mathews, Michael Matli, Michael McBee, Virginia Medina, Fabian Mendoza, Lilton Monteith, Marva Monteith, Glenna Moore, John Moore, Mary Morris, Patricia Moyers, Erica Neal, Alicia Ornelas, Sharon Ostertag, Robert Pena, Dana Phillips, Deborah Phillips, Derek Phillips, Dana (I) Phillips, Michelle Powers, Michelle (I) Powers, Thomas Powers, Larry Price, Dawn Purkey, Tina Quintal, Ute Quintal, Margo Rhine, Robert Rhine, Robert Roberson, Shawn Roberson, Mark Robinson, Mateo Robinson, Melissa Salser, Jose Santiago, Jill Schwyter, Max Schwyter, Martha Scroggs, Ralph Scroggs, Leo Spagnolini, Melanie Stanton, Natasha Steinberg, Rebecca Sunderlin, Terry Sunderlin, Melva Tillar, Shanna Vallejos, Angilo Vera, Efrain Vera-Soto, John Vigil, Robbin Vinyard, Lawrence Walker, Daniel Wallace, Christopher Wheeler, Gwendolyn Whitfield, Roy Whitfield, Denise Williams, Linnita Williams, Timothy Williams, Angel Wilmore, Angel (I) Wilmore, Benjamin Wilmore, Yolanda Wilson, Robbie Wooden, William Wooden, Catherine Zaborski, Maria Zakrzewski. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #23 Order. This case is directly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01196-RBJ-KMT. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) Modified on 9/17/2018 to correct text. (sphil, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/17/2018. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Karen Brant, Michelle Brink, Bradley Buono, Kathleen Burton, Thomas Burton, Jonathan Cannon, Kerri Cannon, Kimberly Chappell, Kimberly (I) Chappell, Amy Clark, Marie Clark, Michael Clark, Timothy Clubb, Kathy Coleman, Jeffery Comfort, Maren Comfort, Maren (I) Comfort, Dennis Crow, Linda Crow, Shirley Crow, Jack Cummings, Kevin Daniels, Sr, Larry Davidson, Kimberly Eckoldt, Ivan Engleman, Marie Engleman, Alexis Esselman, Cheyenne Farrell, Jason Farrell, Skyy Farrell, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Christine Felker, Kevin Felker, Lyndel Felker, Daniel Florez, Kristin Florez, Jeff Frank, Patricia Frank, Marion Garner, Frances Gortmaker, Jerry Gortmaker, Thomas Grabe, Alfred Grant, Dante Grey, Carla Guelker, Justine Hanneman, David Harris, Latischa Harris, Ava Higgins, John Higgins, Shelly-Ann Higgins, Norma Hilde, Thomas Hochberg, Mark Holtorf, Travis Jacobs-Hoffman, Michael Jones, Isabelle Justice, Randall Keiley, Jasmine Kizer, Daniel Kloberdanz, Deborah Kloberdanz, Clifford Knudson, Marne Kosobucki, Marne (I) Kosobucki, Martha Krietemeyer, Daniel Malmquist, Monika Malmquist, Christopher Marinez, Alyssa Martinez, Cameron Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Lynn (I) Martinez, Pete Martinez, David Maslowski, Lorraine Balck, Jeanne Basinger, Kenneth Benjamin, Jr, Lisa P. Benjamin, Lisa (I) P. Benjamin, Christine Bertrand, Athel Bluebird, Arnette Booth, Michelle Boyd, Dawn Maslowski, Michelle Matheny, Thomas Mathews, Tina Mathews, Thomas (I) Mathews, Michael Matli, Michael McBee, Virginia Medina, Fabian Mendoza, Lilton Monteith, Marva Monteith, Glenna Moore, John Moore, Mary Morris, Patricia Moyers, Erica Neal, Alicia Ornelas, Sharon Ostertag, Robert Pena, Dana Phillips, Deborah Phillips, Derek Phillips, Dana (I) Phillips, Michelle Powers, Michelle (I) Powers, Thomas Powers, Larry Price, Dawn Purkey, Tina Quintal, Ute Quintal, Margo Rhine, Robert Rhine, Robert Roberson, Shawn Roberson, Mark Robinson, Mateo Robinson, Melissa Salser, Jose Santiago, Jill Schwyter, Max Schwyter, Martha Scroggs, Ralph Scroggs, Leo Spagnolini, Melanie Stanton, Natasha Steinberg, Rebecca Sunderlin, Terry Sunderlin, Melva Tillar, Shanna Vallejos, Angilo Vera, Efrain Vera-Soto, John Vigil, Robbin Vinyard, Lawrence Walker, Daniel Wallace, Christopher Wheeler, Gwendolyn Whitfield, Roy Whitfield, Denise Williams, Linnita Williams, Timothy Williams, Angel Wilmore, Angel (I) Wilmore, Benjamin Wilmore, Yolanda Wilson, Robbie Wooden, William Wooden, Catherine Zaborski, Maria Zakrzewski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Martha Kriet
June 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Monika Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Monika Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Marinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Marinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alyssa Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alyssa Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cameron Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cameron Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynn Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynn Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynn (I) Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynn (I) Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pete Mart
June 27, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monika Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monika Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Marinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Marinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alyssa Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alyssa Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cameron Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cameron Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynn Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynn Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynn (I) Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynn (I) Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pete Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pete Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Maslowski(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Maslowski(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lorraine Balck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lorraine Balck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeanne Basinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeanne Basinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Benjamin, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Benjamin, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa P. Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa P. Benjamin(pty:pla), At
June 21, 2018 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #15 Notice of Case Association filed by attorney Louise R. Caro. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC by Plaintiffs Karen Brant, Michelle Brink, Bradley Buono, Kathleen Burton, Thomas Burton, Jonathan Cannon, Kerri Cannon, Kimberly Chappell, Kimberly (I) Chappell, Amy Clark, Marie Clark, Michael Clark, Timothy Clubb, Kathy Coleman, Jeffery Comfort, Maren Comfort, Maren (I) Comfort, Dennis Crow, Linda Crow, Shirley Crow, Jack Cummings, Kevin Daniels, Sr, Larry Davidson, Kimberly Eckoldt, Ivan Engleman, Marie Engleman, Alexis Esselman, Cheyenne Farrell, Jason Farrell, Skyy Farrell, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Christine Felker, Kevin Felker, Lyndel Felker, Daniel Florez, Kristin Florez, Jeff Frank, Patricia Frank, Marion Garner, Frances Gortmaker, Jerry Gortmaker, Thomas Grabe, Alfred Grant, Dante Grey, Carla Guelker, Justine Hanneman, David Harris, Latischa Harris, Ava Higgins, John Higgins, Shelly-Ann Higgins, Norma Hilde, Thomas Hochberg, Mark Holtorf, Travis Jacobs-Hoffman, Michael Jones, Isabelle Justice, Randall Keiley, Jasmine Kizer, Daniel Kloberdanz, Deborah Kloberdanz, Clifford Knudson, Marne Kosobucki, Marne (I) Kosobucki, Martha Krietemeyer, Daniel Malmquist, Monika Malmquist, Christopher Marinez, Alyssa Martinez, Cameron Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Lynn (I) Martinez, Pete Martinez, David Maslowski, Lorraine Balck, Jeanne Basinger, Kenneth Benjamin, Jr, Lisa P. Benjamin, Lisa (I) P. Benjamin, Christine Bertrand, Athel Bluebird, Arnette Booth, Michelle Boyd, Dawn Maslowski, Michelle Matheny, Thomas Mathews, Tina Mathews, Thomas (I) Mathews, Michael Matli, Michael McBee, Virginia Medina, Fabian Mendoza, Lilton Monteith, Marva Monteith, Glenna Moore, John Moore, Mary Morris, Patricia Moyers, Erica Neal, Alicia Ornelas, Sharon Ostertag, Robert Pena, Dana Phillips, Deborah Phillips, Derek Phillips, Dana (I) Phillips, Michelle Powers, Michelle (I) Powers, Thomas Powers, Larry Price, Dawn Purkey, Tina Quintal, Ute Quintal, Margo Rhine, Robert Rhine, Robert Roberson, Shawn Roberson, Mark Robinson, Mateo Robinson, Melissa Salser, Jose Santiago, Jill Schwyter, Max Schwyter, Martha Scroggs, Ralph Scroggs, Leo Spagnolini, Melanie Stanton, Natasha Steinberg, Rebecca Sunderlin, Terry Sunderlin, Melva Tillar, Shanna Vallejos, Angilo Vera, Efrain Vera-Soto, John Vigil, Robbin Vinyard, Lawrence Walker, Daniel Wallace, Christopher Wheeler, Gwendolyn Whitfield, Roy Whitfield, Denise Williams, Linnita Williams, Timothy Williams, Angel Wilmore, Angel (I) Wilmore, Benjamin Wilmore, Yolanda Wilson, Robbie Wooden, William Wooden, Catherine Zaborski, Maria Zakrzewski. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/19/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/18/2018, re: #10 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause [Docket No. 7] is hereby discharged. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause #7 by Plaintiffs Karen Brant, Michelle Brink, Bradley Buono, Kathleen Burton, Thomas Burton, Jonathan Cannon, Kerri Cannon, Kimberly Chappell, Kimberly (I) Chappell, Amy Clark, Marie Clark, Michael Clark, Timothy Clubb, Kathy Coleman, Jeffery Comfort, Maren Comfort, Maren (I) Comfort, Dennis Crow, Linda Crow, Shirley Crow, Jack Cummings, Kevin Daniels, Sr, Larry Davidson, Kimberly Eckoldt, Ivan Engleman, Marie Engleman, Alexis Esselman, Cheyenne Farrell, Jason Farrell, Skyy Farrell, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Christine Felker, Kevin Felker, Lyndel Felker, Daniel Florez, Kristin Florez, Jeff Frank, Patricia Frank, Marion Garner, Frances Gortmaker, Jerry Gortmaker, Thomas Grabe, Alfred Grant, Dante Grey, Carla Guelker, Justine Hanneman, David Harris, Latischa Harris, Ava Higgins, John Higgins, Shelly-Ann Higgins, Norma Hilde, Thomas Hochberg, Mark Holtorf, Travis Jacobs-Hoffman, Michael Jones, Isabelle Justice, Randall Keiley, Jasmine Kizer, Daniel Kloberdanz, Deborah Kloberdanz, Clifford Knudson, Marne Kosobucki, Marne (I) Kosobucki, Martha Krietemeyer, Daniel Malmquist, Monika Malmquist, Christopher Marinez, Alyssa Martinez, Cameron Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Lynn (I) Martinez, Pete Martinez, David Maslowski, Lorraine Balck, Jeanne Basinger, Kenneth Benjamin, Jr, Lisa P. Benjamin, Lisa (I) P. Benjamin, Christine Bertrand, Athel Bluebird, Arnette Booth, Michelle Boyd, Dawn Maslowski, Michelle Matheny, Thomas Mathews, Tina Mathews, Thomas (I) Mathews, Michael Matli, Michael McBee, Virginia Medina, Fabian Mendoza, Lilton Monteith, Marva Monteith, Glenna Moore, John Moore, Mary Morris, Patricia Moyers, Erica Neal, Alicia Ornelas, Sharon Ostertag, Robert Pena, Dana Phillips, Deborah Phillips, Derek Phillips, Dana (I) Phillips, Michelle Powers, Michelle (I) Powers, Thomas Powers, Larry Price, Dawn Purkey, Tina Quintal, Ute Quintal, Margo Rhine, Robert Rhine, Robert Roberson, Shawn Roberson, Mark Robinson, Mateo Robinson, Melissa Salser, Jose Santiago, Jill Schwyter, Max Schwyter, Martha Scroggs, Ralph Scroggs, Leo Spagnolini, Melanie Stanton, Natasha Steinberg, Rebecca Sunderlin, Terry Sunderlin, Melva Tillar, Shanna Vallejos, Angilo Vera, Efrain Vera-Soto, John Vigil, Robbin Vinyard, Lawrence Walker, Daniel Wallace, Christopher Wheeler, Gwendolyn Whitfield, Roy Whitfield, Denise Williams, Linnita Williams, Timothy Williams, Angel Wilmore, Angel (I) Wilmore, Benjamin Wilmore, Yolanda Wilson, Robbie Wooden, William Wooden, Catherine Zaborski, Maria Zakrzewski (Caro, Louise) (Modified on 6/14/2018 edited the title of the text to reflect Response)(evana, ). Modified on 7/9/2018 to correct document and event type. (sphil, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #4 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Karen Brant, Michelle Brink, Bradley Buono, Kathleen Burton, Thomas Burton, Jonathan Cannon, Kerri Cannon, Kimberly Chappell, Kimberly (I) Chappell, Amy Clark, Marie Clark, Michael Clark, Timothy Clubb, Kathy Coleman, Jeffery Comfort, Maren Comfort, Maren (I) Comfort, Dennis Crow, Linda Crow, Shirley Crow, Jack Cummings, Kevin Daniels, Sr, Larry Davidson, Kimberly Eckoldt, Ivan Engleman, Marie Engleman, Alexis Esselman, Cheyenne Farrell, Jason Farrell, Skyy Farrell, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Christine Felker, Kevin Felker, Lyndel Felker, Daniel Florez, Kristin Florez, Jeff Frank, Patricia Frank, Marion Garner, Frances Gortmaker, Jerry Gortmaker, Thomas Grabe, Alfred Grant, Dante Grey, Carla Guelker, Justine Hanneman, David Harris, Latischa Harris, Ava Higgins, John Higgins, Shelly-Ann Higgins, Norma Hilde, Thomas Hochberg, Mark Holtorf, Travis Jacobs-Hoffman, Michael Jones, Isabelle Justice, Randall Keiley, Jasmine Kizer, Daniel Kloberdanz, Deborah Kloberdanz, Clifford Knudson, Marne Kosobucki, Marne (I) Kosobucki, Martha Krietemeyer, Daniel Malmquist, Monika Malmquist, Christopher Marinez, Alyssa Martinez, Cameron Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Lynn (I) Martinez, Pete Martinez, David Maslowski, Lorraine Balck, Jeanne Basinger, Kenneth Benjamin, Jr, Lisa P. Benjamin, Lisa (I) P. Benjamin, Christine Bertrand, Athel Bluebird, Arnette Booth, Michelle Boyd, Dawn Maslowski, Michelle Matheny, Thomas Mathews, Tina Mathews, Thomas (I) Mathews, Michael Matli, Michael McBee, Virginia Medina, Fabian Mendoza, Lilton Monteith, Marva Monteith, Glenna Moore, John Moore, Mary Morris, Patricia Moyers, Erica Neal, Alicia Ornelas, Sharon Ostertag, Robert Pena, Dana Phillips, Deborah Phillips, Derek Phillips, Dana (I) Phillips, Michelle Powers, Michelle (I) Powers, Thomas Powers, Larry Price, Dawn Purkey, Tina Quintal, Ute Quintal, Margo Rhine, Robert Rhine, Robert Roberson, Shawn Roberson, Mark Robinson, Mateo Robinson, Melissa Salser, Jose Santiago, Jill Schwyter, Max Schwyter, Martha Scroggs, Ralph Scroggs, Leo Spagnolini, Melanie Stanton, Natasha Steinberg, Rebecca Sunderlin, Terry Sunderlin, Melva Tillar, Shanna Vallejos, Angilo Vera, Efrain Vera-Soto, John Vigil, Robbin Vinyard, Lawrence Walker, Daniel Wallace, Christopher Wheeler, Gwendolyn Whitfield, Roy Whitfield, Denise Williams, Linnita Williams, Timothy Williams, Angel Wilmore, Angel (I) Wilmore, Benjamin Wilmore, Yolanda Wilson, Robbie Wooden, William Wooden, Catherine Zaborski, Maria Zakrzewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strike-Out Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Monika Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Monika Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Marinez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Marinez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alyssa Mart
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/04/2018. ORDERED that, on or before 5:00 p.m. on June 14, 2018, plaintiffs shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Karen Brant, Michelle Brink, Bradley Buono, Kathleen Burton, Thomas Burton, Jonathan Cannon, Kerri Cannon, Kimberly Chappell, Kimberly (I) Chappell, Amy Clark, Marie Clark, Michael Clark, Timothy Clubb, Kathy Coleman, Jeffery Comfort, Maren Comfort, Maren (I) Comfort, Dennis Crow, Linda Crow, Shirley Crow, Jack Cummings, Kevin Daniels, Sr, Larry Davidson, Kimberly Eckoldt, Ivan Engleman, Marie Engleman, Alexis Esselman, Cheyenne Farrell, Jason Farrell, Skyy Farrell, Tina Farrell, Tina (I) Farrell, Christine Felker, Kevin Felker, Lyndel Felker, Daniel Florez, Kristin Florez, Jeff Frank, Patricia Frank, Marion Garner, Frances Gortmaker, Jerry Gortmaker, Thomas Grabe, Alfred Grant, Dante Grey, Carla Guelker, Justine Hanneman, David Harris, Latischa Harris, Ava Higgins, John Higgins, Shelly-Ann Higgins, Norma Hilde, Thomas Hochberg, Mark Holtorf, Travis Jacobs-Hoffman, Michael Jones, Isabelle Justice, Randall Keiley, Jasmine Kizer, Daniel Kloberdanz, Deborah Kloberdanz, Clifford Knudson, Marne Kosobucki, Marne (I) Kosobucki, Martha Krietemeyer, Daniel Malmquist, Monika Malmquist, Christopher Marinez, Alyssa Martinez, Cameron Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Lynn (I) Martinez, Pete Martinez, David Maslowski, Lorraine Balck, Jeanne Basinger, Kenneth Benjamin, Jr, Lisa P. Benjamin, Lisa (I) P. Benjamin, Christine Bertrand, Athel Bluebird, Arnette Booth, Michelle Boyd, Dawn Maslowski, Michelle Matheny, Thomas Mathews, Tina Mathews, Thomas (I) Mathews, Michael Matli, Michael McBee, Virginia Medina, Fabian Mendoza, Lilton Monteith, Marva Monteith, Glenna Moore, John Moore, Mary Morris, Patricia Moyers, Erica Neal, Alicia Ornelas, Sharon Ostertag, Robert Pena, Dana Phillips, Deborah Phillips, Derek Phillips, Dana (I) Phillips, Michelle Powers, Michelle (I) Powers, Thomas Powers, Larry Price, Dawn Purkey, Tina Quintal, Ute Quintal, Margo Rhine, Robert Rhine, Robert Roberson, Shawn Roberson, Mark Robinson, Mateo Robinson, Melissa Salser, Jose Santiago, Jill Schwyter, Max Schwyter, Martha Scroggs, Ralph Scroggs, Leo Spagnolini, Melanie Stanton, Natasha Steinberg, Rebecca Sunderlin, Terry Sunderlin, Melva Tillar, Shanna Vallejos, Angilo Vera, Efrain Vera-Soto, John Vigil, Robbin Vinyard, Lawrence Walker, Daniel Wallace, Christopher Wheeler, Gwendolyn Whitfield, Roy Whitfield, Denise Williams, Linnita Williams, Timothy Williams, Angel Wilmore, Angel (I) Wilmore, Benjamin Wilmore, Yolanda Wilson, Robbie Wooden, William Wooden, Catherine Zaborski, Maria Zakrzewski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended complaint)(Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER re: #4 Amended Complaint. On or before May 25, 2018, plaintiffs shall file a notice that complies with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a). By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/24/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc, 3M Company, The, National Foam Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly (I) Chappell (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marie Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maren (I) Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina (I) Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark Holtorf(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Clifford Knudson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marne Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marne (I) Kosobucki(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Martha Krietemeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Monika Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Monika Malmquist(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Marinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Marinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alyssa Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alyssa Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cameron Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cameron Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lynn Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lynn Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lynn (I) Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lynn (I) Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pete Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pete Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Maslowski(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Maslowski(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lorraine Balck(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lorraine Balck(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeanne Basinger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeanne Basinger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Benjamin, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kennet
May 16, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc, National Foam Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6106119)Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lorraine Balck(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lorraine Balck(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeanne Basinger(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeanne Basinger(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kenneth Benjamin, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kenneth Benjamin, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lisa P. Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lisa P. Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Christine Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Christine Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Athel Bluebird(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Athel Bluebird(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Arnette Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Arnette Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Karen Brant(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bradley Buono(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kathleen Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Thomas Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party S. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party S. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party H. C.1(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party H. C.1(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party J. C.1(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party J. C.1(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party H. C.2(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party H. C.2(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party J. C.2(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party J. C.2(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jonathan Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kerri Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kimberly Chappell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Timothy Clubb(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kathy Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeffery Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Maren Comfort(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dennis Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Linda Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shirley Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jack Cummings(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kevin Daniels, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Larry Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kimberly Eckoldt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ivan Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marie Engleman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alexis Esselman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party P. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party P. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cheyenne Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jason Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Skyy Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tina Farrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Christine Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kevin Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lyndel Felker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Daniel Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kristin Florez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeff Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Patricia Frank(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marion Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Frances Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jerry Gortmaker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Thomas Grabe(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alfred Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dante Grey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carla Guelker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Justine Hanneman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party David Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Latischa Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ava Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shelly-Ann Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Norma Hilde(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Thomas Hochberg(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark Holtore(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark Holtore(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Travis Jacobs-Hoffman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Isabelle Justice(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party K. K.1(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party K. K.1(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party K. K.2(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party K. K.2(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Randall Keiley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jasmine Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Daniel Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Deborah Kloberdanz(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle ad

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Clark
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Felker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Krietemeyer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Wilmore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Grey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Purkey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wallace
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Rhine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mathews
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maren Comfort
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Esselman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Farrell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latischa Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Florez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas (I) Mathews
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana (I) Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Whitfield
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marva Monteith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Grabe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Moyers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Guelker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa (I) P. Benjamin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mateo Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marne Kosobucki
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbin Vinyard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabelle Justice
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Morris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Salser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Crow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Hanneman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Balck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Maslowski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rhine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Wooden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Vallejos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly (I) Chappell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Buono
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wheeler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Bertrand
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Farrell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyy Farrell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilton Monteith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Maslowski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Higgins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Spagnolini
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa P. Benjamin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Schwyter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Quintal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnette Booth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Matheny
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Crow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Burton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Boyd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Engleman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Frank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Coleman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Schwyter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Sunderlin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Steinberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linnita Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieutenant Alfred Grant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Ornelas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Davidson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Frank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Felker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly-Ann Higgins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Sunderlin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Roberson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Whitfield
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina (I) Farrell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Powers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ava Higgins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Brant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Burton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Stanton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maren (I) Comfort
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn (I) Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Roberson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angilo Vera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Kizer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Santiago, .
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Matli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Marinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Wilmore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zakrzewski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Kloberdanz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Scroggs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Chappell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Farrell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Malmquist
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Basinger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Keiley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Eckoldt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Malmquist
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Medina
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cannon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ostertag
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pena
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Comfort
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Hilde
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Mendoza
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kloberdanz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melva Tillar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Powers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Holtorf
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Vera-Soto
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marne (I) Kosobucki
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ute Quintal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McBee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athel Bluebird
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Knudson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Cummings
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Garner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndel Felker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Mathews
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hochberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Benjamin, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Clark
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenna Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) Powers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel (I) Wilmore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Clark
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Jacobs-Hoffman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Gortmaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Florez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Brink
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Zaborski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wooden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Gortmaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Clubb
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Crow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Engleman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Daniels, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Scroggs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Cannon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?