Taylor et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Trenton Werner, Paul Kaiser, Juanita Jones-Vaughn, Johnny Skalla, Juanita Davis, Timothy Tunnell, Shanna Mabie, Ronnie Bartlett, Joseph Edmundson, Clyde Kenebrew, Rickey Allen Long, Kenneth Steffy, Kristina Lipsky, Florence Paradise, Tracy Stevenson, Nancy Waller, Trevala Jara, Kimberly Burkett, Chris Miller, Jeanette Herring, Migdalia Maldonado, Lisa Wilson, Renita Williams, Rae Defoor, Jana Torres, Luvie Maciel, Tocarra Laster, Marie Eltagonde, Elizabeth Johnson, Pamela Goring, Ivan Chambers, Marla Best, Danielle (I) Maestas, Regina Chambers, Patricia Wickham, Angela Penn, Lou Pepper, Terry Davis, Beatrice Herbrandson, Annie Banks, Renita (I) Williams, Kevin Humphrey, Emma Torres, Ryan Kile, Marilynn Johnson, William Lohman, Shalice (I) Steffy, Jacob Wickham, Nicole Miller, Rebecca Berwick, Tommy Jara, Donald Best, Patricia Humphrey, Robert Dale, Shannon Vachon, Nanett Healey, Elizabeth Hutchins, Jessica Opps, Erin Evans, Ryan Igou, Martin (I) R Mendez, Maria Fruge, Ariel Boyd, Miguel Maldonado, Julie Diamond, Elizabeth Weisshaar, Angela (I) C Beuerle, James Cook, Angela C Beuerle, Jeffery Exline, Randall Coff, Kristy Hanscom, Mark Gibson, David Vaughn, Sr., Shelby (I) L McClain, Regina (I) Chambers, Brianna Robertson, Martin R Mendez, Mickey Paone, William Harvey, Daniela Krause, Michael Barrows, Kayne Fevig, Christopher Malmquist, Johnnie Bartlett, Shelbie Norwood, Brian Kessler, Dana Flinders, Dottie Cortez, Leon Clark, June Miller, Janice Bodholdt, Jarrett Flinders, Dr William Ramsey, Vannessa Calica, Sandy Tramaglino, Alan Hutchins, Mitchell Hrbac, Debbie Cortez, Danielle Maestas, Erin (I) Evans, Ayumi Towles, Debra Long, Frank Goring, Nicholas (I) Krause, James Wadkowski, Coty Best, Larry Fruge, Shalice Steffy, Tiffany Neal, Theresa Dale, Julie Norwood, Benjamin Frahm, Linda Winston, Suzanne Arnold, Thomas Towles, Latasha Cormier, Marcus Ollie, Gloria Ramsey, Daniel Lipsky, Misty Phillips, Cynthia Strempke, Kayla Casanova, Elaine Sandy, Tim Waters, Mark Flinders, Shelby L McClain, Kelvin (I) Thomas, Benjamin (I) Frahm, Kenneth Fish, Roberta Verano, Sylvana Kenebrew, Maureen Tunnell, Patricia Conmy, Mark Strempke, Nicholas Krause, Tomika Jones, Casaundra Hrbac, Dennis Craven, Andrew King, Alvin Hancock, Pamela Bishop, Francisco Maciel, Andrew Hassler, Kendra Sambrana, Latrina Ollie, Gretel Harrison, Sgt Belinda Davis, Larry Thirsk, Shanna (I) Mabie, James Largent, Stanley Hrbac, Kelvin Thomas, Joanne Harvey, Michelle Cook, Pauline Long, Eddie Cook, Chelsy Cole, Amber Roberson, Scott Herring, Kristine Rodriguez, Louis Hofman, Terri Darling, Alexa Sanders, Krystal Hrbac, Stacy Sinischo, Jacqueline Pena Holguin, Pamela Owens, Andrew Mardakis, Jim Montoya, Kaden Martin, Joseph Evans, Landon Flinders, Stella Kolozy, Rosie Taylor, Justin Weaver, Tina Richter, Mathew Panozzo, Linda Hofman, Malachy Cortez, Stephen Sandy, Jennifer Clark, Margaret Greene, Diann Rieger, Mickey Gooden, Jessica (I) Opps, Ingeburg Reinhard and Kayde Baker
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Chemguard and Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03406
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 Any plaintiff whose case would be subject to transfer to the AFFF MDL proceedings may file his or her case directly in the District of South Carolina, in accordance with Paragraphs 25 through 29 of CMO 3. The shell case number for cases related to the AFFF MDL is 2:19-av-55555. Please file the new complaint into this shell case and file as attachments Answers to LR 26.01 Interrogatories and a Summons (to be issued). The complaint will be assigned a new civil action number. Civil cover sheets need not be filed for cases directly filed in the AFFF MDL. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 63 et al (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Reason: Transcript will be refiled in master docket only per ECF technical issue re access Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Organization of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Organization of Defendants' Counsel, Additional Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Committee Members, Rights and Privileges Preserved, Attorneys' Time and Expense Records, Monthly Status Conferences, Motions Practice, Status Conference on April 5, 2019 (see prior NOTICE at Dkt. No. 30), Other Matters. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/20/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 25 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 45 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG and spread in error to all member cases) Reason: Motion to appoint defense counsel removed and submitted to Chambers, per Chambers. Motion and all related deadlines to be removed from mn and all cv member cases. Filing date of original filing: 3/15/2019 (Response due date of original filing: 3/29/2019 terminated) Clerk's Notice Reminder: Per CMO No. 1, Filing, documents which relate to All Actions shall be filed and docketed in the master case only; when ECF prompts with the question, "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" counsel should choose "No." Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 4/5/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01201, Taylor et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03406-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01201. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01201 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Marla Best, Angela C Beuerle, Angela (I) C Beuerle, Pamela Bishop, Janice Bodholdt, Ariel Boyd, Kimberly Burkett, Vannessa Calica, Kayla Casanova, Ivan Chambers, Regina Chambers, Regina (I) Chambers, Jennifer Clark, Leon Clark, Randall Coff, Chelsy Cole, Patricia Conmy, Eddie Cook, James Cook, Michelle Cook, Latasha Cormier, Debbie Cortez, Dottie Cortez, Malachy Cortez, Dennis Craven, Robert Dale, Theresa Dale, Terri Darling, Belinda Davis, Juanita Davis, Terry Davis, Rae Defoor, Julie Diamond, Joseph Edmundson, Marie Eltagonde, Erin Evans, Erin (I) Evans, Joseph Evans, Jeffery Exline, Kayne Fevig, Kenneth Fish, Dana Flinders, Jarrett Flinders, Landon Flinders, Mark Flinders, Benjamin Frahm, Benjamin (I) Frahm, Larry Fruge, Maria Fruge, Mark Gibson, Mickey Gooden, Frank Goring, Pamela Goring, Margaret Greene, Alvin Hancock, Kristy Hanscom, Gretel Harrison, Joanne Harvey, William Harvey, Andrew Hassler, Nanett Healey, Beatrice Herbrandson, Jeanette Herring, Scott Herring, Linda Hofman, Louis Hofman, Casaundra Hrbac, Krystal Hrbac, Mitchell Hrbac, Stanley Hrbac, Kevin Humphrey, Patricia Humphrey, Alan Hutchins, Elizabeth Hutchins, Ryan Igou, Tommy Jara, Trevala Jara, Elizabeth Johnson, Marilynn Johnson, Tomika Jones, Juanita Jones-Vaughn, Paul Kaiser, Clyde Kenebrew, Sylvana Kenebrew, Brian Kessler, Ryan Kile, Andrew King, Stella Kolozy, Daniela Krause, Nicholas Krause, Nicholas (I) Krause, James Largent, Tocarra Laster, Daniel Lipsky, Kristina Lipsky, William Lohman, Debra Long, Pauline Long, Rickey Allen Long, Shanna Mabie, Shanna (I) Mabie, Francisco Maciel, Luvie Maciel, Danielle Maestas, Danielle (I) Maestas, Suzanne Arnold, Kayde Baker, Annie Banks, Michael Barrows, Johnnie Bartlett, Ronnie Bartlett, Rebecca Berwick, Coty Best, Donald Best, Migdalia Maldonado, Miguel Maldonado, Christopher Malmquist, Andrew Mardakis, Kaden Martin, Shelby L McClain, Shelby (I) L McClain, Martin R Mendez, Martin (I) R Mendez, Chris Miller, June Miller, Nicole Miller, Jim Montoya, Tiffany Neal, Julie Norwood, Shelbie Norwood, Latrina Ollie, Marcus Ollie, Jessica Opps, Jessica (I) Opps, Pamela Owens, Mathew Panozzo, Mickey Paone, Florence Paradise, Jacqueline Pena Holguin, Angela Penn, Lou Pepper, Misty Phillips, Gloria Ramsey, William Ramsey, Ingeburg Reinhard, Tina Richter, Diann Rieger, Amber Roberson, Brianna Robertson, Kristine Rodriguez, Kendra Sambrana, Alexa Sanders, Elaine Sandy, Stephen Sandy, Stacy Sinischo, Johnny Skalla, Kenneth Steffy, Shalice Steffy, Shalice (I) Steffy, Tracy Stevenson, Cynthia Strempke, Mark Strempke, Rosie Taylor, Larry Thirsk, Kelvin Thomas, Kelvin (I) Thomas, Emma Torres, Jana Torres, Ayumi Towles, Thomas Towles, Sandy Tramaglino, Maureen Tunnell, Timothy Tunnell, Shannon Vachon, David Vaughn, Sr, Roberta Verano, James Wadkowski, Nancy Waller, Tim Waters, Justin Weaver, Elizabeth Weisshaar, Trenton Werner, Jacob Wickham, Patricia Wickham, Renita Williams, Renita (I) Williams, Lisa Wilson, Linda Winston. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Marla Best, Angela C Beuerle, Angela (I) C Beuerle, Pamela Bishop, Janice Bodholdt, Ariel Boyd, Kimberly Burkett, Vannessa Calica, Kayla Casanova, Ivan Chambers, Regina Chambers, Regina (I) Chambers, Jennifer Clark, Leon Clark, Randall Coff, Chelsy Cole, Patricia Conmy, Eddie Cook, James Cook, Michelle Cook, Latasha Cormier, Debbie Cortez, Dottie Cortez, Malachy Cortez, Dennis Craven, Robert Dale, Theresa Dale, Terri Darling, Belinda Davis, Juanita Davis, Terry Davis, Rae Defoor, Julie Diamond, Joseph Edmundson, Marie Eltagonde, Erin Evans, Erin (I) Evans, Joseph Evans, Jeffery Exline, Kayne Fevig, Kenneth Fish, Dana Flinders, Jarrett Flinders, Landon Flinders, Mark Flinders, Benjamin Frahm, Benjamin (I) Frahm, Larry Fruge, Maria Fruge, Mark Gibson, Mickey Gooden, Frank Goring, Pamela Goring, Margaret Greene, Alvin Hancock, Kristy Hanscom, Gretel Harrison, Joanne Harvey, William Harvey, Andrew Hassler, Nanett Healey, Beatrice Herbrandson, Jeanette Herring, Scott Herring, Linda Hofman, Louis Hofman, Casaundra Hrbac, Krystal Hrbac, Mitchell Hrbac, Stanley Hrbac, Kevin Humphrey, Patricia Humphrey, Alan Hutchins, Elizabeth Hutchins, Ryan Igou, Tommy Jara, Trevala Jara, Elizabeth Johnson, Marilynn Johnson, Tomika Jones, Juanita Jones-Vaughn, Paul Kaiser, Clyde Kenebrew, Sylvana Kenebrew, Brian Kessler, Ryan Kile, Andrew King, Stella Kolozy, Daniela Krause, Nicholas Krause, Nicholas (I) Krause, James Largent, Tocarra Laster, Daniel Lipsky, Kristina Lipsky, William Lohman, Debra Long, Pauline Long, Rickey Allen Long, Shanna Mabie, Shanna (I) Mabie, Francisco Maciel, Luvie Maciel, Danielle Maestas, Danielle (I) Maestas, Suzanne Arnold, Kayde Baker, Annie Banks, Michael Barrows, Johnnie Bartlett, Ronnie Bartlett, Rebecca Berwick, Coty Best, Donald Best, Migdalia Maldonado, Miguel Maldonado, Christopher Malmquist, Andrew Mardakis, Kaden Martin, Shelby L McClain, Shelby (I) L McClain, Martin R Mendez, Martin (I) R Mendez, Chris Miller, June Miller, Nicole Miller, Jim Montoya, Tiffany Neal, Julie Norwood, Shelbie Norwood, Latrina Ollie, Marcus Ollie, Jessica Opps, Jessica (I) Opps, Pamela Owens, Mathew Panozzo, Mickey Paone, Florence Paradise, Jacqueline Pena Holguin, Angela Penn, Lou Pepper, Misty Phillips, Gloria Ramsey, William Ramsey, Ingeburg Reinhard, Tina Richter, Diann Rieger, Amber Roberson, Brianna Robertson, Kristine Rodriguez, Kendra Sambrana, Alexa Sanders, Elaine Sandy, Stephen Sandy, Stacy Sinischo, Johnny Skalla, Kenneth Steffy, Shalice Steffy, Shalice (I) Steffy, Tracy Stevenson, Cynthia Strempke, Mark Strempke, Rosie Taylor, Larry Thirsk, Kelvin Thomas, Kelvin (I) Thomas, Emma Torres, Jana Torres, Ayumi Towles, Thomas Towles, Sandy Tramaglino, Maureen Tunnell, Timothy Tunnell, Shannon Vachon, David Vaughn, Sr, Roberta Verano, James Wadkowski, Nancy Waller, Tim Waters, Justin Weaver, Elizabeth Weisshaar, Trenton Werner, Jacob Wickham, Patricia Wickham, Renita Williams, Renita (I) Williams, Lisa Wilson, Linda Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela (I) C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela (I) C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Regina (I) Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Regina (I) Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erin (I) Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erin (I) Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin (I) Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin (I) Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeanette Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeanette Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Scott Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Scott Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Louis Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Louis Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Casaundra Hrbac(pty
June 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela (I) C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela (I) C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina (I) Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina (I) Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erin (I) Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erin (I) Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin (I) Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin (I) Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeanette Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeanette Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Scott Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Scott Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Louis Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Louis Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Casaundra Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Casaundra Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Krystal Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Krystal Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mitchell Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mitchell Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stanley Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stanley Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Humphrey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Humphrey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Humphrey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Humphrey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alan Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alan Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. M
June 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela (I) C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela (I) C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina (I) Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina (I) Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin (I) Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin (I) Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin (I) Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin (I) Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeanette Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeanette Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Louis Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Louis Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Casaundra Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Casaundra Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Krystal Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Krystal Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchell Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchell Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stanley Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stanley Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Humphrey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Humphrey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Humphrey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Humphrey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alan Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alan Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ryan Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ryan Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tommy Jara(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tommy Jara(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trevala Jara(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trevala Jara(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilynn Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilynn Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tomika Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tomika Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly
June 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #6 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Marla Best, Angela C Beuerle, Angela (I) C Beuerle, Pamela Bishop, Janice Bodholdt, Ariel Boyd, Kimberly Burkett, Vannessa Calica, Kayla Casanova, Ivan Chambers, Regina Chambers, Regina (I) Chambers, Jennifer Clark, Leon Clark, Randall Coff, Chelsy Cole, Patricia Conmy, Eddie Cook, James Cook, Michelle Cook, Latasha Cormier, Debbie Cortez, Dottie Cortez, Malachy Cortez, Dennis Craven, Robert Dale, Theresa Dale, Terri Darling, Belinda Davis, Juanita Davis, Terry Davis, Rae Defoor, Julie Diamond, Joseph Edmundson, Marie Eltagonde, Erin Evans, Erin (I) Evans, Joseph Evans, Jeffery Exline, Kayne Fevig, Kenneth Fish, Dana Flinders, Jarrett Flinders, Landon Flinders, Mark Flinders, Benjamin Frahm, Benjamin (I) Frahm, Larry Fruge, Maria Fruge, Mark Gibson, Mickey Gooden, Frank Goring, Pamela Goring, Margaret Greene, Alvin Hancock, Kristy Hanscom, Gretel Harrison, Joanne Harvey, William Harvey, Andrew Hassler, Nanett Healey, Beatrice Herbrandson, Jeanette Herring, Scott Herring, Linda Hofman, Louis Hofman, Casaundra Hrbac, Krystal Hrbac, Mitchell Hrbac, Stanley Hrbac, Kevin Humphrey, Patricia Humphrey, Alan Hutchins, Elizabeth Hutchins, Ryan Igou, Tommy Jara, Trevala Jara, Elizabeth Johnson, Marilynn Johnson, Tomika Jones, Juanita Jones-Vaughn, Paul Kaiser, Clyde Kenebrew, Sylvana Kenebrew, Brian Kessler, Ryan Kile, Andrew King, Stella Kolozy, Daniela Krause, Nicholas Krause, Nicholas (I) Krause, James Largent, Tocarra Laster, Daniel Lipsky, Kristina Lipsky, William Lohman, Debra Long, Pauline Long, Rickey Allen Long, Shanna Mabie, Shanna (I) Mabie, Francisco Maciel, Luvie Maciel, Danielle Maestas, Danielle (I) Maestas, Suzanne Arnold, Kayde Baker, Annie Banks, Michael Barrows, Johnnie Bartlett, Ronnie Bartlett, Rebecca Berwick, Coty Best, Donald Best, Migdalia Maldonado, Miguel Maldonado, Christopher Malmquist, Andrew Mardakis, Kaden Martin, Shelby L McClain, Shelby (I) L McClain, Martin R Mendez, Martin (I) R Mendez, Chris Miller, June Miller, Nicole Miller, Jim Montoya, Tiffany Neal, Julie Norwood, Shelbie Norwood, Latrina Ollie, Marcus Ollie, Jessica Opps, Jessica (I) Opps, Pamela Owens, Mathew Panozzo, Mickey Paone, Florence Paradise, Jacqueline Pena Holguin, Angela Penn, Lou Pepper, Misty Phillips, Gloria Ramsey, William Ramsey, Ingeburg Reinhard, Tina Richter, Diann Rieger, Amber Roberson, Brianna Robertson, Kristine Rodriguez, Kendra Sambrana, Alexa Sanders, Elaine Sandy, Stephen Sandy, Stacy Sinischo, Johnny Skalla, Kenneth Steffy, Shalice Steffy, Shalice (I) Steffy, Tracy Stevenson, Cynthia Strempke, Mark Strempke, Rosie Taylor, Larry Thirsk, Kelvin Thomas, Kelvin (I) Thomas, Emma Torres, Jana Torres, Ayumi Towles, Thomas Towles, Sandy Tramaglino, Maureen Tunnell, Timothy Tunnell, Shannon Vachon, David Vaughn, Sr, Roberta Verano, James Wadkowski, Nancy Waller, Tim Waters, Justin Weaver, Elizabeth Weisshaar, Trenton Werner, Jacob Wickham, Patricia Wickham, Renita Williams, Renita (I) Williams, Lisa Wilson, Linda Winston. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela (I) C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela (I) C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina (I) Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina (I) Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Erin (I) Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Erin (I) Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benjamin (I) Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benjamin (I) Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeanette Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeanette Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Scott Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Scott Herring(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Louis Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Louis Hofman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Casaundra Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Casaundra Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Krystal Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Krystal Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mitchell Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mitchell Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stanley Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stanley Hrbac(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Jame
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Restrict. The #1 Complaint shall be restricted at Level 3. However, to the extent any of the annotations containing work product reflect accurate information, the Plaintiffs are advised that Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 provides: "(b) Representations to the Court. By presenting to the court a pleading, written motion, or other paper--whether by signing, filing, submitting, or later advocating it--an attorney or unrepresented party certifies that to the best of the person's knowledge, information, and belief, formed after an inquiry reasonable under the circumstances:... (3) the factual contentions have evidentiary support or, if specifically so identified, will likely have evidentiary support after a reasonable opportunity for further investigation or discovery." By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc, 3M Company, The, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., filed by Marla Best, Angela C Beuerle, Angela (I) C Beuerle, Pamela Bishop, Janice Bodholdt, Ariel Boyd, Kimberly Burkett, Vannessa Calica, Kayla Casanova, Ivan Chambers, Regina Chambers, Regina (I) Chambers, Jennifer Clark, Leon Clark, Randall Coff, Chelsy Cole, Patricia Conmy, Eddie Cook, James Cook, Michelle Cook, Latasha Cormier, Debbie Cortez, Dottie Cortez, Malachy Cortez, Dennis Craven, Robert Dale, Theresa Dale, Terri Darling, Belinda Davis, Juanita Davis, Terry Davis, Rae Defoor, Julie Diamond, Joseph Edmundson, Marie Eltagonde, Erin Evans, Erin (I) Evans, Joseph Evans, Jeffery Exline, Kayne Fevig, Kenneth Fish, Dana Flinders, Jarrett Flinders, Landon Flinders, Mark Flinders, Benjamin Frahm, Benjamin (I) Frahm, Larry Fruge, Maria Fruge, Mark Gibson, Mickey Gooden, Frank Goring, Pamela Goring, Margaret Greene, Alvin Hancock, Kristy Hanscom, Gretel Harrison, Joanne Harvey, William Harvey, Andrew Hassler, Nanett Healey, Beatrice Herbrandson, Jeanette Herring, Scott Herring, Linda Hofman, Louis Hofman, Casaundra Hrbac, Krystal Hrbac, Mitchell Hrbac, Stanley Hrbac, Kevin Humphrey, Patricia Humphrey, Alan Hutchins, Elizabeth Hutchins, Ryan Igou, Tommy Jara, Trevala Jara, Elizabeth Johnson, Marilynn Johnson, Tomika Jones, Juanita Jones-Vaughn, Paul Kaiser, Clyde Kenebrew, Sylvana Kenebrew, Brian Kessler, Ryan Kile, Andrew King, Stella Kolozy, Daniela Krause, Nicholas Krause, Nicholas (I) Krause, James Largent, Tocarra Laster, Daniel Lipsky, Kristina Lipsky, William Lohman, Debra Long, Pauline Long, Rickey Allen Long, Shanna Mabie, Shanna (I) Mabie, Francisco Maciel, Luvie Maciel, Danielle Maestas, Danielle (I) Maestas, Suzanne Arnold, Kayde Baker, Annie Banks, Michael Barrows, Johnnie Bartlett, Ronnie Bartlett, Rebecca Berwick, Coty Best, Donald Best, Migdalia Maldonado, Miguel Maldonado, Christopher Malmquist, Andrew Mardakis, Kaden Martin, Shelby L McClain, Shelby (I) L McClain, Martin R Mendez, Martin (I) R Mendez, Chris Miller, June Miller, Nicole Miller, Jim Montoya, Tiffany Neal, Julie Norwood, Shelbie Norwood, Latrina Ollie, Marcus Ollie, Jessica Opps, Jessica (I) Opps, Pamela Owens, Mathew Panozzo, Mickey Paone, Florence Paradise, Jacqueline Pena Holguin, Angela Penn, Lou Pepper, Misty Phillips, Gloria Ramsey, William Ramsey, Ingeburg Reinhard, Tina Richter, Diann Rieger, Amber Roberson, Brianna Robertson, Kristine Rodriguez, Kendra Sambrana, Alexa Sanders, Elaine Sandy, Stephen Sandy, Stacy Sinischo, Johnny Skalla, Kenneth Steffy, Shalice Steffy, Shalice (I) Steffy, Tracy Stevenson, Cynthia Strempke, Mark Strempke, Rosie Taylor, Larry Thirsk, Kelvin Thomas, Kelvin (I) Thomas, Emma Torres, Jana Torres, Ayumi Towles, Thomas Towles, Sandy Tramaglino, Maureen Tunnell, Timothy Tunnell, Shannon Vachon, David Vaughn, Sr, Roberta Verano, James Wadkowski, Nancy Waller, Tim Waters, Justin Weaver, Elizabeth Weisshaar, Trenton Werner, Jacob Wickham, Patricia Wickham, Renita Williams, Renita (I) Williams, Lisa Wilson, Linda Winston.(Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs Marla Best, Angela C Beuerle, Angela (I) C Beuerle, Pamela Bishop, Janice Bodholdt, Ariel Boyd, Kimberly Burkett, Vannessa Calica, Kayla Casanova, Ivan Chambers, Regina Chambers, Regina (I) Chambers, Jennifer Clark, Leon Clark, Randall Coff, Chelsy Cole, Patricia Conmy, Eddie Cook, James Cook, Michelle Cook, Latasha Cormier, Debbie Cortez, Dottie Cortez, Malachy Cortez, Dennis Craven, Robert Dale, Theresa Dale, Terri Darling, Belinda Davis, Juanita Davis, Terry Davis, Rae Defoor, Julie Diamond, Joseph Edmundson, Marie Eltagonde, Erin Evans, Erin (I) Evans, Joseph Evans, Jeffery Exline, Kayne Fevig, Kenneth Fish, Dana Flinders, Jarrett Flinders, Landon Flinders, Mark Flinders, Benjamin Frahm, Benjamin (I) Frahm, Larry Fruge, Maria Fruge, Mark Gibson, Mickey Gooden, Frank Goring, Pamela Goring, Margaret Greene, Alvin Hancock, Kristy Hanscom, Gretel Harrison, Joanne Harvey, William Harvey, Andrew Hassler, Nanett Healey, Beatrice Herbrandson, Jeanette Herring, Scott Herring, Linda Hofman, Louis Hofman, Casaundra Hrbac, Krystal Hrbac, Mitchell Hrbac, Stanley Hrbac, Kevin Humphrey, Patricia Humphrey, Alan Hutchins, Elizabeth Hutchins, Ryan Igou, Tommy Jara, Trevala Jara, Elizabeth Johnson, Marilynn Johnson, Tomika Jones, Juanita Jones-Vaughn, Paul Kaiser, Clyde Kenebrew, Sylvana Kenebrew, Brian Kessler, Ryan Kile, Andrew King, Stella Kolozy, Daniela Krause, Nicholas Krause, Nicholas (I) Krause, James Largent, Tocarra Laster, Daniel Lipsky, Kristina Lipsky, William Lohman, Debra Long, Pauline Long, Rickey Allen Long, Shanna Mabie, Shanna (I) Mabie, Francisco Maciel, Luvie Maciel, Danielle Maestas, Danielle (I) Maestas, Suzanne Arnold, Kayde Baker, Annie Banks, Michael Barrows, Johnnie Bartlett, Ronnie Bartlett, Rebecca Berwick, Coty Best, Donald Best, Migdalia Maldonado, Miguel Maldonado, Christopher Malmquist, Andrew Mardakis, Kaden Martin, Shelby L McClain, Shelby (I) L McClain, Martin R Mendez, Martin (I) R Mendez, Chris Miller, June Miller, Nicole Miller, Jim Montoya, Tiffany Neal, Julie Norwood, Shelbie Norwood, Latrina Ollie, Marcus Ollie, Jessica Opps, Jessica (I) Opps, Pamela Owens, Mathew Panozzo, Mickey Paone, Florence Paradise, Jacqueline Pena Holguin, Angela Penn, Lou Pepper, Misty Phillips, Gloria Ramsey, William Ramsey, Ingeburg Reinhard, Tina Richter, Diann Rieger, Amber Roberson, Brianna Robertson, Kristine Rodriguez, Kendra Sambrana, Alexa Sanders, Elaine Sandy, Stephen Sandy, Stacy Sinischo, Johnny Skalla, Kenneth Steffy, Shalice Steffy, Shalice (I) Steffy, Tracy Stevenson, Cynthia Strempke, Mark Strempke, Rosie Taylor, Larry Thirsk, Kelvin Thomas, Kelvin (I) Thomas, Emma Torres, Jana Torres, Ayumi Towles, Thomas Towles, Sandy Tramaglino, Maureen Tunnell, Timothy Tunnell, Shannon Vachon, David Vaughn, Sr, Roberta Verano, James Wadkowski, Nancy Waller, Tim Waters, Justin Weaver, Elizabeth Weisshaar, Trenton Werner, Jacob Wickham, Patricia Wickham, Renita Williams, Renita (I) Williams, Lisa Wilson, Linda Winston. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorneyTate James Kunkle. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 1 RISTRICTED DOCUMENT LEVEL 3: COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc, National Foam Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6106932)Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Suzanne Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Suzanne Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party A. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party A. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayde Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayde Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Annie Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Annie Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Barrows(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Barrows(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Johnnie Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Johnnie Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ronnie Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ronnie Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rebecca Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rebecca Berwick(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Coty Best(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Coty Best(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Donald Best(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Donald Best(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marla Best(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Angela C Beuerle(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Pamela Bishop(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Janice Bodholdt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ariel Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kimberly Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party D. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party D. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Z. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Z. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Vannessa Calica(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayla Casanova(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ivan Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jennifer Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Leon Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Randall Coff(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chelsy Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Patricia Conmy(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Eddie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Debbie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dottie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Malachy Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dennis Craven(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Theresa Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Terri Darling(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Belinda Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Juanita Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rae Defoor(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Julie Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party A. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party A. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party D. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party D. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party M. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party M. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party S. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party S. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Edmundson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marie Eltagonde(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Erin Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeffery Exline(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party E. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party E. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayne Fevig(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kenneth Fish(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jarrett Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Landon Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Maria Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mickey Gooden(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Frank Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Pamela Goring(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Margaret Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alvin Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kristy Hanscom(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gretel Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joanne Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party William Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Andrew Hassler(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Nanett Healey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Beatrice Herbrandson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party J

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenton Werner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Kaiser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Jones-Vaughn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Skalla
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Tunnell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Mabie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Bartlett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Edmundson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Kenebrew
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Allen Long
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Steffy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Lipsky
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Paradise
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Stevenson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Waller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevala Jara
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Burkett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Herring
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Maldonado
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renita Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rae Defoor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana Torres
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luvie Maciel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tocarra Laster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Eltagonde
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Goring
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Chambers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Best
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle (I) Maestas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Chambers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Penn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Pepper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Herbrandson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Banks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renita (I) Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Humphrey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Torres
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Kile
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilynn Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lohman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalice (I) Steffy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Berwick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Jara
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Best
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Humphrey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dale
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Vachon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanett Healey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hutchins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Opps
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Evans
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Igou
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin (I) R Mendez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fruge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Boyd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Maldonado
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Diamond
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Weisshaar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela (I) C Beuerle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cook
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela C Beuerle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Exline
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Coff
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Hanscom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gibson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vaughn, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby (I) L McClain
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina (I) Chambers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Robertson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin R Mendez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickey Paone
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harvey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Krause
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Barrows
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayne Fevig
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Malmquist
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Bartlett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelbie Norwood
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kessler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Flinders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dottie Cortez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Clark
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Bodholdt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrett Flinders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr William Ramsey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vannessa Calica
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Tramaglino
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Hutchins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Hrbac
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Cortez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Maestas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin (I) Evans
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayumi Towles
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Long
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Goring
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas (I) Krause
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wadkowski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coty Best
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Fruge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalice Steffy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Dale
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Norwood
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Frahm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Winston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Arnold
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Towles
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Cormier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Ollie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ramsey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lipsky
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Strempke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Casanova
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Sandy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Waters
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Flinders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby L McClain
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin (I) Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin (I) Frahm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Fish
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Verano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvana Kenebrew
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Tunnell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Conmy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Strempke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Krause
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomika Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casaundra Hrbac
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Craven
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew King
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Hancock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Bishop
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Maciel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hassler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Sambrana
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrina Ollie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretel Harrison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sgt Belinda Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Thirsk
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna (I) Mabie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Largent
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Hrbac
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Harvey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cook
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Long
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Cook
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsy Cole
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Roberson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Herring
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Rodriguez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Hofman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Darling
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Sanders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Hrbac
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Sinischo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Pena Holguin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Owens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Mardakis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Montoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets |